Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:20-ap-01068
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2020
Terminated:Sep 01, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Connecticut Container Corp.
455 Sackett Point Road
North Haven, CT 06473
Represented By
Connecticut Container Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
Chapter 7 Trustee 5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 notice Withdrawal of Document Tue 02/18 10:05 AM
Notice of Withdrawal with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 7 Chapter 12/13 Report and Account
7 7 trustee Chapter 12/13 Report and Account Tue 02/18 9:08 AM
Chapter 13 Trustee's Report and Account and Notice of Deadline for Objections. Objections must be filed within 30 days of the date of service of this Notice. . (Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/01 9:08 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 20-1068 Dismissed Complaint (nc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/01 9:09 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1068 Closed (nc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
6 6 notice Notice Mon 08/17 12:35 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 07/24 3:43 PM
Endorsed Order dated 7/24/2020 RE:4 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [RE:1 Complaint]. THE TIME FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER IS HEREBY EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING AUGUST 21, 2020. (nc)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extend Time Fri 07/24 3:10 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [Re:1 Complaint]. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 07/24 3:45 PM
Connecticut Container Corp. Answer Deadline Reset for 8/21/2020 (nc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/25 1:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on Connecticut Container Corp. 6/25/2020 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/22 7:27 AM
Summons Issued on Connecticut Container Corp. Answer Due 7/22/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/19 4:34 PM
Adversary case 20-01068 Complaint by John O. Desmond against Connecticut Container Corp.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]