Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 1:19-bk-11824
Case Filed:May 29, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Jul 02, 2019

Debtor
National Fish and Seafood Inc.
11-15 Parker St
Gloucester, MA 01930-3017
Represented By
James Addison Wright, III
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King - B
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109
Trustee
John O. Desmond
5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Zachary J. Gregoricus
Murtha Cullina
contact info
Michael Connolly
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info
Mark G. DeGiacomo
Murtha Cullina
contact info
Thomas S. Vangel
Murtha Cullina
contact info
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina
contact info

GPO Feb 26 2021
Memorandum of Decision Re: 144 Motion filed by Interested Party Todd Provost, Defendants Michael Bruno, Jack Ventola for Relief from Stay Re: Entry of an Order Authorizing the Payment and/or Advancement of Defense Costs under the Debtor's D&O Policy. See Memorandum of Decision for Full Text. (ymw)

Docket last updated: 11/26/2024 10:06 AM EST
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
crditcrd none Wed 05/29 5:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 19-11824 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 18067657, amount $ 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7b (Use for AutoAssign Only) Wed 05/29 6:50 PM
Meeting of Creditors is scheduled on 07/02/2019 at 09:30 AM at Room 325-B, U.S. Trustee Office, J.W. McCormack Post Office & Court House. (admin, )
Related: [-]
court Meeting of Creditors 7b (Use for AutoAssign Only) Wed 05/29 6:50 PM
DISREGARD Meeting of Creditors is scheduled on 07/02/2019 at 09:30 AM at Room 325-B, U.S. Trustee Office, J.W. McCormack Post Office & Court House. (admin, )
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 05/29 5:35 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals All Schedules and Statements and Matrix. Filing Fee in the Amount of $335 Filed by National Fish and Seafood Inc.. (Wright, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Supplemental Document Wed 05/29 5:42 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Related [+] filed by Debtor National Fish and Seafood Inc. (Wright, James)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
3 3 misc Schedules (Original) Wed 05/29 5:48 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Verified Declaration filed by Debtor National Fish and Seafood Inc. (Wright, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 200 pgs misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 05/29 5:49 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual filed by Debtor National Fish and Seafood Inc. (Wright, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 05/29 5:51 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney James Addison Wright III in the amount of $1,605,755.47. Plus $0.00 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor National Fish and Seafood Inc. (Wright, James)
Related: [-]