Desmond v. EBP Supply Solutions, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Frank J Bailey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01069 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
EBP Supply Solutions, Inc.
200 Research Drive
Milford, CT 06460 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
Chapter 7 Trustee 5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 08/18 9:23 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 20-1069 Dismissed Complaint. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 08/18 9:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1069 Closed. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
||
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Endorsed Order dated 7/14/2020 Re:4 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. GRANTED. THE TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING AUGUST 21, 2020. (jreg) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [Re:1 Complaint]. (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Tue 07/14 3:51 PM
Defendant EBP Supply Solutions, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 8/21/2020. (jreg) |
||
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Service Executed on EBP Supply Solutions, Inc. 6/25/2020 (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on EBP Supply Solutions, Inc. Answer Due 7/22/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-01069 Complaint by John O. Desmond against EBP Supply Solutions, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Desmond, John) |