Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:20-ap-01071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2020
Terminated:Feb 08, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
H&M Transport, Inc.
7 Landsdowne Street
Boston, MA 02115
Represented By
H&M Transport, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
Chapter 7 Trustee 5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 08, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 02/08 4:14 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 20-01071 The Parties Stipulated to Dismissal of the Adversary Proceeding. (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/08 4:14 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1071 Closed (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 01/21 5:22 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff John O. Desmond, Defendant H&M Transport, Inc. of Dismissal with Prejudice with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond, Defendant H&M Transport, Inc. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
court Entry Tue 01/19 11:11 AM
Order granting Motion to Compromise entered in Main Case No. 19-11824 Document #145. (sl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 12/21 4:10 PM
Endorsed Order dated 12/21/2020 Re:16 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [Re:10 Amended Complaint] GRANTED. THE TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE DEFEND IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 5, 2021. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extend Time Mon 12/21 3:38 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [Re:10 Amended Complaint] with certificate of service. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
court Entry Wed 12/23 9:17 AM
Motion to Compromise filed in Maine Case 19-11824 Document # 138. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 11/20 3:15 PM
Endorsed Order dated 11/20/2020 Re:14 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer Re:10 Amended Complaint. GRANTED. THE TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE DEFEND IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING DECEMBER 23, 2020. (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extend Time Fri 11/20 2:07 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [Re:10 Amended Complaint] with certificate of service. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/26 9:50 AM
Summons Service Executed on H&M Transport, Inc. 10/26/2020 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/24 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/23/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Amend
Thursday, October 22, 2020
11 11 court Alias Summons Issued Thu 10/22 2:23 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Defendant H&M Transport, Inc. Re:10 Amended Complaint. Answer Due 11/23/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/22 1:48 PM
Amended Complaint by Jonathan Horne on behalf of John O. Desmond against all defendants. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Wed 10/21 12:08 PM
Order dated 10/21/2020 Re:8 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond for Leave to File Amended Adversary Complaint and for Issuance of Alias Summons. GRANTED. ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 28, 2020 AT 4:30 PM, THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE FIRST AMENDED ADVERSARY COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO THE INSTANT MOTION. AFTER SUCH COMPLAINT IS FILED, THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE AN ALIAS SUMMONS. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
8 8 motion Amend Fri 10/02 11:11 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond for Leave to File Amended Adversary Complaint and for Issuance of Alias Summons d [Re:1 Complaint] with certificate of service. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Amended Adversary Complaint
Thursday, October 01, 2020
7 7 crtretm Court Returned Mail and Notice to Debtor Thu 10/01 2:42 PM
Returned Mail Re:5 Order returned to the Court by USPS as undeliverable. Invalid address for H&M Transport, Inc. 7 Landsdowne Street, Boston, MA 02215-3412. Pursuant to MLBR 2002-4, it is the responsibility of the debtor and/or debtors counsel to maintain the accuracy of the master mailing matrix and any amendments to it. The debtors attorney, or the debtor if pro se, must attempt to correct any incorrect addresses, resend the returned notices and notify the Court as to the address corrections. (sl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 09/18 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/15 9:13 AM
Order dated 9/15/2020 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON AUGUST 14, 2020, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 2, 2020, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 08/14 10:24 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to H&M Transport, Inc. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/25 1:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on H&M Transport, Inc. 6/25/2020 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/22 7:41 AM
Summons Issued on H&M Transport, Inc. Answer Due 7/22/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/19 4:51 PM
Adversary case 20-01071 Complaint by John O. Desmond against H&M Transport, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]