Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:20-ap-01077
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2020
Terminated:Oct 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Oxford Graphics, LLC
10 Centennial Drive West Entrance
Peabody, MA 01960
Represented By
Oxford Graphics, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
Chapter 7 Trustee 5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, October 02, 2020
6 6 notice Notice Fri 10/02 11:58 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 10/02 1:51 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 20-01077 Voluntary Dismissal Complaint. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/02 1:55 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1077 Closed . (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
court Entry Tue 09/08 11:47 AM
Clerk's Entry: A Motion to Approve Compromise has been filed in the main case 19-11824 See # 113. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 07/24 2:25 PM
Endorsed Order dated 7/24/2020 RE:4 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [Re:1 Complaint]. THE TIME FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER IS HEREBY EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING SEPTEMBER 1, 2020. (nc)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extend Time Fri 07/24 1:38 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [Re:1 Complaint]. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 07/24 2:27 PM
Oxford Graphics, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 9/1/2020 (nc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/25 1:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Oxford Graphics, LLC 6/25/2020 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/22 8:00 AM
Summons Issued on Oxford Graphics, LLC Answer Due 7/22/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/19 5:12 PM
Adversary case 20-01077 Complaint by John O. Desmond against Oxford Graphics, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]