Mortera v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Halil S Ozerden |
Referred: | John C Gargiulo |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00224 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 02, 2021 6:03 AM CST |
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilberto Alarcon Mortera
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
86 | 86
appeal
Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate
Wed 06/15 9:17 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE as to82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gilberto Alarcon Mortera. Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed; and that plaintiff-appellant pay to defendant-appellee the costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk. (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Cover Letter | ||
85 | 85
appeal
Copy of Opinion - USCA
Wed 06/15 9:14 AM
Copy of Opinion - USCA re82 Notice of Appeal, (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Cover Letter |