Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05630
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2020
Re-opened:Jun 09, 2020
Terminated:Dec 14, 2021
Case in other court:California Northern, 4:18-cv-02588
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2021 4:20 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Plaintiff
FRED DRESCH
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
SANDRA SMITH
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TOMI PIRONTI
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EDDIE SMITH
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARRAE DOWLING SMITH
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIELLE SINGLETON
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH SHAW
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRETT SAVAGE
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FRED SALIBA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BERNADETTE ROBINSON-SHIELDS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE ROBINSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SHANE RIEDER
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TERESA RESUELLO
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN RAHN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT ZUPAN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY TILLEMANS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA ZUNIGA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN ZIELONKA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AMY WILLIAMS-FISHER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE WILLIAMS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SUNITA VAID
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AMANDA TURNEY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SHERRY TRIPLETT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HOANG TRAN
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA SOLORZANO
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SARIENYA THOMAS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BOBBIE THOMAS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMMY STIGARS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON STEPHENS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELICA STEPHENS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LEILANI STARR
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY STAAHL
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LOREN PANLILIO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LETICIA ALKIRE
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CELESTE BURTON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RONALD CURLAND
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KARLA FINKE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MALISA GREEN
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA HILL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LANCE KANG
Terminated: 10/22/2020
6968 JULIAN LANE
FONTANA, CA 92336
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALBERT KNIGHT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHEN LABE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KIRUMA LACEFIELD
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICIA LARRY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIKA RENEE LAVIN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHY LAWSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PRECIOUS LEWIS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA LOCH
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MUHAMMEDIYA LOTT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSE ACEVEDO MARTI
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMATHA MCCUSKER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN MCLEAN
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CATHY MICHENER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEOFFREY MILLER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER MORGAN
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD MUSGRAVE
Terminated: 10/22/2020
193 DAKAR DR
PACHECO, CA 94553
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BABAK NADERI
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN NICHOLS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ASHLEY OGLE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CASSANDRA ORANGE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GARY PARK
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info

GPO May 18 2018
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Motion to Stay. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
GPO Jun 25 2018
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE JULY 26, 2018, HEARING SESSION ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)[Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
30 30 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/14 4:18 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the parties reached a settlement of the above-referenced case. The case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court and the Clerk is directed to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/14/2021. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
29 29 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/28 8:11 AM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed with prejudice from multi-plaintiff California complaints on October 4 or November 20, 2019, while the cases were still pending in California state court. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. CHARRAE DOWLING SMITH and HOANG TRAN terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
28 28 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 10/22 3:44 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A only, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/22/2020. LANCE KANG and RICHARD MUSGRAVE terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
27 27 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/21 12:48 PM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed from multi-plaintiff California complaints by stipulation of the parties for lack of personal jurisdiction on October 1, 2018. See Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1008. Thereafter, the California complaints were remanded to California state court. See id., ECF No. 1043. The California complaints later were re-removed and transferred to the MDL, pursuant to the Court's Order dated February 5, 2020. See ECF No. 1238. On re-removal, all of the California plaintiffs were returned to the Court's active docket-including the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A, whose claims were previously dismissed. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/21/2020. LINDA HILL, ALBERT KNIGHT, STEPHEN LABE, KIRUMA LACEFIELD, ERIKA RENEE LAVIN, KATHY LAWSON, MUHAMMEDIYA LOTT, JOSE ACEVEDO MARTI, TAMATHA MCCUSKER, CATHY MICHENER, GEOFFREY MILLER, STEVEN NICHOLS, ASHLEY OGLE, CASSANDRA ORANGE, LOREN PANLILIO, TOMI PIRONTI, RYAN RAHN, JACQUELINE ROBINSON, BERNADETTE ROBINSON-SHIELDS, ELIZABETH SHAW, EDDIE SMITH, ANGELICA STEPHENS, JASON STEPHENS, TAMMY STIGARS, BOBBIE THOMAS, SARIENYA THOMAS, SHERRY TRIPLETT, AMANDA TURNEY, SUNITA VAID, MICHELLE WILLIAMS, AMY WILLIAMS-FISHER, ROBERT ZUPAN, CELESTE BURTON and KARLA FINKE terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
26 26 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/02 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by RICHARD MUSGRAVE (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/02 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by LANCE KANG (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
24 24 3 pgs order Order Wed 09/02 2:16 PM
ORDER granting 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by LANCE KANG, and 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by RICHARD MUSGRAVE. Counsel is directed to promptly provide the plaintiffs with a copy of this Order and to file a written notice of compliance with the Court, together with an address for the plaintiffs where all future filings and correspondence involving their cases should be directed. Thereafter, Behram V. Parekh, Esq. and the law firm of Kirtland & Packard LLP are relieved of any further obligation for representation of the plaintiffs in those matters. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/2/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/01 3:36 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RICHARD MUSGRAVE. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/01 3:33 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LANCE KANG. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 09/01 4:06 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Without Substitution (Plaintiff, Lance Kang),23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Without Substitution (Plaintiff, Richard Musgrave) (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
21 21 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
20 20 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 07/13 10:01 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-02588. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/13 10:11 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
19 19 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
18 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company regarding Second Notice of Removal . (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
17 17 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the clerk to re-open Davis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2584 Green v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2588 Evans v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2614 Adeniran v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2620 Booth v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5114 and Stone v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5118 The Court further DIRECTS Defendant TO SHOW CAUSE why its "second notices of removal" filed in each case are procedurally proper and timely under 18 U.S.C. § 1446. Defendant shall file a statement of two pages or less by June 15, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
***Case Reopened Per order at docket# 17 . (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadline: Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
16 16 DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, and 1446 against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
Case has been successfully transferred to the Northern District of Florida. Their case number is 3:18-cv-01494. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
15 15 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE JULY 26, 2018, HEARING SESSION ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
14 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Motion to Stay. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
13 13 MOTION to Remand filed by Leticia Alkire, Celeste Burton, Ronald Curland, Fred Dresch, Karla Finke, Malisa Green, Linda Hill, Lance Kang, Albert Knight, Stephen Labe, Kiruma Lacefield, Patricia Larry, Erika Renee Lavin, Kathy Lawson, Precious Lewis, Maria Loch, Muhammediya Lott, Jose Acevedo Marti, Tamatha McCusker, Ryan McLean, Cathy Michener, Geoffrey Miller, Jennifer Morgan, Richard Musgrave, Babak Naderi, Steven Nichols, Ashley Ogle, Cassandra Orange, Loren Panlilio, Gary Park, Tomi Pironti, Ryan Rahn, Teresa Resuello, Shane Rieder, Jacqueline Robinson, Bernadette Robinson-Shields, Fred Saliba, Brett Savage, Elizabeth Shaw, Danielle Singleton, Charrae Dowling Smith, Eddie Smith, Sandra Smith, Maria Solorzano, Jeffrey Staahl, Leilani Starr, Angelica Stephens, Jason Stephens, Tammy Stigars, Bobbie Thomas, Sarienya Thomas, Timothy Tillemans, Hoang Tran, Sherry Triplett, Amanda Turney, Sunita Vaid, Michelle Williams, Amy Williams-Fisher, John Zielonka, Maria Zuniga, Robert Zupan. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/31/2018. Replies due by 6/7/2018.(Parekh, Behram) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
11 11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/30/2018. Replies due by 6/6/2018.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL
10 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a status conference has been set for May 29, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
9 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-00254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
7 7 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
6 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
5 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG18902958. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12320533). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet