Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05631
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2020
Re-opened:Jun 09, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Case in other court:California Northern, 4:18-cv-02584
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2021 6:38 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
VERONICA WILSON
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RONDA WELLS
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN VERGARA
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TANISHA SANTEE
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PAUL QUINBY
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MORRIS MCCLOUD
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA FLOWERS-HECK
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL DRAYTON
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MENTORIA DAVIS
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
EVELYN ZEPEDA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEAN SMITH
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RAYMUNDO REA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROMEAR PRICE
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JACKLYN PALMER
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PAMELA MARBERRY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE LEIGHTON
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS KELLY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANNE KALICZAK
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
FRANK JOHNSON
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info

GPO May 18 2018
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Motion to Stay. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
GPO Jun 25 2018
ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE JULY 26, 2018, HEARING SESSION ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)[Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
GPO Jul 08 2020
MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida. Signed by MDL Panel on 07/01/20. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
23 23 18 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/28 8:18 AM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed with prejudice from multi-plaintiff California complaints on October 4 or November 20, 2019, while the cases were still pending in California state court. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 10/27 3:50 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the cases identified on Exhibit A were settled under the global settlement program for this litigation. Accordingly, the cases are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. FRANK JOHNSON terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
21 21 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
20 20 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 07/13 2:47 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-02584. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/13 2:48 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
19 19 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida. Signed by MDL Panel on 07/01/20. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
18 18 RESPONSE TO 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Regarding Second Notice of Removal by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 6/16/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
17 17 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the clerk to re-open Davis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2584 Green v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2588 Evans v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2614 Adeniran v. Bristol-Myers Squibb, Case No. 18-2620 Booth v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5114 and Stone v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5118 The Court further DIRECTS Defendant TO SHOW CAUSE why its "second notices of removal" filed in each case are procedurally proper and timely under 18 U.S.C. § 1446. Defendant shall file a statement of two pages or less by June 15, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
***Case Reopened.*** Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
16 16 DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.'S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, and 1446 against Mentoria Davis, Michael Drayton, Angela Flowers-Heck, Frank Johnson, Anne Kaliczak, Thomas Kelly, Michelle Leighton, Pamela Marberry, Morris McCloud, Jacklyn Palmer, Romear Price, Paul Quinby, Raymundo Rea, Tanisha Santee, Dean Smith, Steven Vergara, Ronda Wells, Veronica Wilson, Evelyn Zepeda. Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 5/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
Case has been successfully transferred to the Northern District of Florida. Their case number is 3:18-cv-01493. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
15 15 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE JULY 26, 2018, HEARING SESSION ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
14 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Motion to Stay. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] Re:13 MOTION to Remand filed by Dean Smith, Angela Flowers-Heck, Raymundo Rea, Evelyn Zepeda, Anne Kaliczak, Thomas Kelly, Michelle Lei ghton, Morris McCloud, Mentoria Davis, Ronda Wells, Michael Drayton, Paul Quinby, Pamela Marberry, Veronica Wilson, Steven Vergara, Romear Price, Frank Johnson, Jacklyn Palmer, Tanisha Santee. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Please be sure that the Judge's name is reflected as Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on the signature line of all future proposed orders submitted and that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4 :18-cv-02584-HSG. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
13 13 MOTION to Remand filed by Mentoria Davis, Michael Drayton, Angela Flowers-Heck, Frank Johnson, Anne Kaliczak, Thomas Kelly, Michelle Leighton, Pamela Marberry, Morris McCloud, Jacklyn Palmer, Romear Price, Paul Quinby, Raymundo Rea, Tanisha Santee, Dean Smith, Steven Vergara, Ronda Wells, Veronica Wilson, Evelyn Zepeda. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/31/2018. Replies due by 6/7/2018.(Parekh, Behram) Modified on 1/23/2019 (ndrS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
11 11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/30/2018. Replies due by 6/6/2018.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL
10 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a status conference has been set for May 29, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
9 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-00254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
7 7 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
5 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-566166. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12319727). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet