Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05651
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2020
Re-opened:Jun 24, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:18-cv-05021
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2021 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHANNELL LOBATO
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BEVERLY LAWSON
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SUELI DA LUZ SERPA
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JACOB HOWZE
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
SHELLEY MAUGER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE NICHOLS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JULIEN MOE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LEON METTLIER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHERYL MCPHERSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARVA MCLAUGHLIN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ABRIGALE WORTHY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENDA MCGEE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGARET MCCLEASE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SUSAN MCCAMMON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LANYETTA NOLE-DUPREE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHAN MARTINEZ
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA LYONS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMIEKA LOWE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTINE LAWLESS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VIVIAN LAMB
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RONALD LABEAUD
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHIRLEY KIRKPATRICK
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA SMITH
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT WEST
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBIN WAGNER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHI VELA
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CRAIG VACCARO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TRACEY TRAMMELL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROSE BOYD TOLVER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PARVATIE SUKHRAM
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RITA SPENCER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES SMITH, JR
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CRYSTAL WELCH
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TONYA SLIGER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBORAH SCHOCKLEY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DERRICK RICHARDSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE PRESTON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA PETRO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SMITTIE PETERSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KIA WHEELER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA WOODS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NINA COOK
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGERY DOYLE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALICE DIEBNER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BENITA DERSOOKIAS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT DAVIS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENDA DAVIES
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN DARLAND
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT COX
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGEL CORRALEJO
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VINCENT CORDOVANO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL KENDLE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAUN CHEATHAM
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DONALD CARRILLO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENDA CANTRELL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN CAMPBELL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TWILA BUTLER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JACOB BATTEN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CONNIE BALCH
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VIRGINIA AYALA-GARCIA
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE ANDERSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALISA FAST
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH KOVEIN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARLON KELLER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE JULIANO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
EUGENE JORSKI
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TRENT JOHNSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TASHINA JEMES
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARCELLA JACARUSO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN HENSON
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAINNON HEARN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLOTTE HARPER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DARRYL HARDIN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHNITA GUIDRY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LA'TASHA GRAHAM
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VICKIE FULMER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SUZANNE FUDESCO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARLENE FREELY-CARLTON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RENEE FORD-THOMAS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARQUITA EMBREY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info

GPO Jul 10 2020
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-032) by MDL Panel (MDL 2734)transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
24 24 18 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/28 8:38 AM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed with prejudice from multi-plaintiff California complaints on October 4 or November 20, 2019, while the cases were still pending in California state court. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (case closed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
23 23 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/21 1:55 PM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed from multi-plaintiff California complaints by stipulation of the parties for lack of personal jurisdiction on October 1, 2018. See Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1008. Thereafter, the California complaints were remanded to California state court. See id., ECF No. 1043. The California complaints later were re-removed and transferred to the MDL, pursuant to the Court's Order dated February 5, 2020. See ECF No. 1238. On re-removal, all of the California plaintiffs were returned to the Court's active docket-including the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A, whose claims were previously dismissed. Because those plaintiff' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/21/2020. CONNIE BALCH, JACOB BATTEN, TWILA BUTLER, BRIAN CAMPBELL, BRENDA CANTRELL, DONALD CARRILLO, SHAUN CHEATHAM, NINA COOK, VINCENT CORDOVANO, SCOTT COX, BRIAN DARLAND, BRENDA DAVIES, BENITA DERSOOKIAS, ALICE DIEBNER, MARGERY DOYLE, MARQUITA EMBREY, ALISA FAST, RENEE FORD-THOMAS, MARLENE FREELY-CARLTON, SUZANNE FUDESCO, VICKIE FULMER, LA'TASHA GRAHAM, JOHNITA GUIDRY, DARRYL HARDIN, CHARLOTTE HARPER, JAINNON HEARN, MARCELLA JACARUSO, TASHINA JEMES, TRENT JOHNSON, EUGENE JORSKI, JACQUELINE JULIANO, MARLON KELLER, MICHAEL KENDLE, KENNETH KOVEIN, VIVIAN LAMB, KRISTINE LAWLESS, JAMIEKA LOWE, LISA LYONS, SHELLEY MAUGER, SUSAN MCCAMMON, MARGARET MCCLEASE, BRENDA MCGEE, MARVA MCLAUGHLIN, CHERYL MCPHERSON, LEON METTLIER, JULIEN MOE, STEPHANIE NICHOLS, LANYETTA NOLE-DUPREE, SMITTIE PETERSON, MARIA PETRO, MICHELLE PRESTON, DERRICK RICHARDSON, DEBORAH SCHOCKLEY, TONYA SLIGER, ANGELA SMITH, JAMES SMITH, JR, RITA SPENCER, PARVATIE SUKHRAM, ROSE BOYD TOLVER, TRACEY TRAMMELL, CRAIG VACCARO, KATHI VELA, ROBIN WAGNER, CRYSTAL WELCH, ROBERT WEST, KIA WHEELER, LINDA WOODS, ABRIGALE WORTHY, MICHELLE ANDERSON and VIRGINIA AYALA-GARCIA terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
22 22 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
21 21 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 07/17 10:39 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-05021. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 07/17 10:40 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:21 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
Case transferred to the Northern District of Florida via ECF. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
20 20 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-032) by MDL Panel (MDL 2734)transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
19 19 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 18 Stipulation to Re-Open Case. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
18 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
17 17 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 16 Stipulation to Continue Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2020. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 02:30 PM. Parties shall use the following dial-in information: Dial In: 888-684-8852 Access Code: 5862990# (tvnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
16 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
15 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2020. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 02:30 PM. Parties shall use the following dial-in information: Dial In: 888-684-8852 Access Code: 5862990# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
14 14 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL [DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, and 1446] against All Plaintiffs. Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, August 31, 2018
13 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-23) IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLOE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2734 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Case e-transferred to the Northern District of Florida and opened as case# 3:18-cv-2062. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 27, 2018
12 12 ORDER STAYING CASE, Motions terminated: 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. Signed by Judge Susan illston on 8/24/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/27/2018 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
11 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
10 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
9 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (tfS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Standing Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, August 23, 2018
8 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/23/18.(haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
7 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ERRATA re4 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd... (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-568917. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12601859). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) Modified on 8/22/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet