Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05653
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2020
Re-opened:Jun 23, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:18-cv-05016
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2021 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
SUSAN NOVICK
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA TROTTER
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOCELYN RHIMES
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
BARBARA OATIS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VERONICA RAMIREZ
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CANDACE PROTIC
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY POW
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALBERT PONIEDZIALEK
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
EFFIE PITTMAN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STELLA PEREZ
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GWENDOLYN PATTERSON
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TERRA PAINTER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NARONDA REED
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
IRMA NEWSOME
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHY MOTZNO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LUZ MEJIA
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID MEACHAM
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHERRY MCGINTY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEXANDER SHEN
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SINDI WIDENSKY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CRAIG HUDDLESTON, JR
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TIANNA WILLIAMS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE WHITAKER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
OSCAR VARGAS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DENISE TWIFORD
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALLISON TAYLOR
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA SPRUILL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KARL MALDANADO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
REBECCA SCOTT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RICE SANCHEZ
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DONALD SALAZAR, JR
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
FRANCINE ROBINSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL ROBERTS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
APRIL RINEHART
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DIANE RHONE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN CARVER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
FAY FORREST
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RONALD FERGUSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JASMINE ELDRIDGE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BILLIE DENNIS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALZENA CUMMINGS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SUZANNA COMBS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SOMSITH CHINDAVONG
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TEVIS CHILDS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALAINA LYONS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NESHELL CARTER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STACEY BURLEY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JANET BOTELLO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KEITH BEAN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TRACY BAILEY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENDA ANTILLON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE ALAO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARY AKINS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
EVA GARCIA
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ERNEST MCDAY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHERRY LORD
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT LANDERS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY LAMAR
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KIARA KUYKENDALL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DONNA KONIGSMARK
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIE JONES
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LATASHA JOHNSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LAI-LA JOHNSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN HURNDON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BONNIE HUNT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDRE HUDSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TANNYA HOLLAND
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES GREEN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHANETT GREEN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JERALD GOFFNEY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PAULA GALLERANI
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info

GPO Jul 09 2020
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) by MDL Panel (MDL 2734) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
21 21 18 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/28 9:19 AM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed with prejudice from multi-plaintiff California complaints on October 4 or November 20, 2019, while the cases were still pending in California state court. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (case closed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
20 20 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/21 2:16 PM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed from multi-plaintiff California complaints by stipulation of the parties for lack of personal jurisdiction on October 1, 2018. See Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1008. Thereafter, the California complaints were remanded to California state court. See id., ECF No. 1043. The California complaints later were re-removed and transferred to the MDL, pursuant to the Court's Order dated February 5, 2020. See ECF No. 1238. On re-removal, all of the California plaintiffs were returned to the Court's active docket-including the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A, whose claims were previously dismissed. Because those plaintiff' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/21/2020. BRENDA ANTILLON, TRACY BAILEY, KEITH BEAN, JANET BOTELLO, STACEY BURLEY, NESHELL CARTER, JOHN CARVER, TEVIS CHILDS, SOMSITH CHINDAVONG, SUZANNA COMBS, ALZENA CUMMINGS, BILLIE DENNIS, JASMINE ELDRIDGE, RONALD FERGUSON, FAY FORREST, PAULA GALLERANI, EVA GARCIA, JERALD GOFFNEY, CHANETT GREEN, JAMES GREEN, TANNYA HOLLAND, CRAIG HUDDLESTON, JR, ANDRE HUDSON, BONNIE HUNT, KEVIN HURNDON, LAI-LA JOHNSON, LATASHA JOHNSON, WILLIE JONES, DONNA KONIGSMARK, KIARA KUYKENDALL, KIMBERLY LAMAR, ROBERT LANDERS, SHERRY LORD, ALAINA LYONS, KARL MALDANADO, ERNEST MCDAY, SHERRY MCGINTY, DAVID MEACHAM, LUZ MEJIA, KATHY MOTZNO, IRMA NEWSOME, TERRA PAINTER, STELLA PEREZ, EFFIE PITTMAN, ALBERT PONIEDZIALEK, ANTHONY POW, CANDACE PROTIC, VERONICA RAMIREZ, NARONDA REED, DIANE RHONE, MICHAEL ROBERTS, FRANCINE ROBINSON, REBECCA SCOTT, ANGELA SPRUILL, ALLISON TAYLOR, DENISE TWIFORD, OSCAR VARGAS, CHRISTINE WHITAKER, TIANNA WILLIAMS, SINDI WIDENSKY, MARY AKINS and JACQUELINE ALAO terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
19 19 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
18 18 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 07/17 11:12 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-05016. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 07/17 12:36 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
17 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) by MDL Panel (MDL 2734) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
16 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 STIPULATED REQUEST TO REOPEN CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
15 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
14 14 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL [DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, and 1446] against All Plaintiffs. Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, August 31, 2018
13 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-23) IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLOE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2734 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Case e-transferred to the Northern District of Florida and opened as case# 3:18-cv-2061. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
12 12 ORDER GRANTING 10 STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
11 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
10 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
9 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/22/18.(haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
8 8 ERRATA re6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
7 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd... (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
5 5 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Withdrawal of Ground of Removal (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and L.R. 3-15 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441 and 1446; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568926, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12601222). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 8/20/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]