Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05683
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Case in other court:California Northern, 4:18-cv-04931
Last checked: Saturday Jan 23, 2021 5:20 AM EST
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
JOSEPH MUSIC
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA LORRAINE JETT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHAN KENT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KENYA MALONE
Terminated: 10/22/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TROY MARABUTO
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSE ACEVEDO MARTI
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RANDY WILLIAMS
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MISTY MILEY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TABATHA MORRISSEY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KAREN SHARP
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
IMARI NICOLOFF
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NINA UEDA
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PAMELA THOMPSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREEL PARSONS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER PORTER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SUSAN RAY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ELLANDRIA STUBBS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
IAN ROCKER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
REBECCA JAMES
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SONIA AGUILERA
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHLOE ANGULO
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE BAYNE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARCUS BEST
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANITA BRADLEY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MELANI BRITTON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAWN BUTKUS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RICKEY CAMPBELL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MELANIE CHASE
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DONYAI CORBETT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TERESA CUNNINGHAM
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BARRY DELL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DOCK FILLIPE FLOYD
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEMARKIUS GLASPIE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KAREN HAMILTON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOEY HERBERT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WALTER HORN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ASHLEY JACKSON
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MIESHA KELLAM-KING
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Carlson Law Firm - Killeen Tx
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info

GPO Aug 29 2018
MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
25 25 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/28 9:46 AM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed with prejudice from multi-plaintiff California complaints on October 4 or November 20, 2019, while the cases were still pending in California state court. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. RANDY WILLIAMS, MELANIE CHASE and NINA UEDA terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 10/27 4:06 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the cases identified on Exhibit A were settled under the global settlement program for this litigation. Accordingly, the cases are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. JOSEPH MUSIC terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
23 23 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 10/22 3:34 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A only, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/22/2020. KENYA MALONE terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
22 22 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/21 3:35 PM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed from multi-plaintiff California complaints by stipulation of the parties for lack of personal jurisdiction on October 1, 2018. See Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1008. Thereafter, the California complaints were remanded to California state court. See id., ECF No. 1043. The California complaints later were re-removed and transferred to the MDL, pursuant to the Court's Order dated February 5, 2020. See ECF No. 1238. On re-removal, all of the California plaintiffs were returned to the Courts active docket-including the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A, whose claims were previously dismissed. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/21/2020. ANITA BRADLEY, MELANI BRITTON, SHAWN BUTKUS, RICKEY CAMPBELL, DONYAI CORBETT, BARRY DELL, DEMARKIUS GLASPIE, KAREN HAMILTON, JOEY HERBERT, WALTER HORN, REBECCA JAMES, ANGELA LORRAINE JETT, MIESHA KELLAM-KING, JONATHAN KENT, JOSE ACEVEDO MARTI, JEREEL PARSONS, JENNIFER PORTER, KAREN SHARP, ELLANDRIA STUBBS, PAMELA THOMPSON, SONIA AGUILERA and STEPHANIE BAYNE terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
21 21 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
20 20 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 07/27 2:07 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-04931. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/27 2:07 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
19 19 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by MDL Panel Clerk on 7/8/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
18 18 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 17 Stipulation to Re-Open Case.(amgS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
17 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Plaintiffs, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
16 16 DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, and 1446 against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, August 31, 2018
Case Electronically Transferred to the Northern District of Florida as case 3:18-cv-02065. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
15 15 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 27, 2018
14 14 Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 11 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
13 13 REMINDER: Pursuant to L.R. Rule 5-1(g), proposed orders shall be submitted in Word format to the specific address on Judge Armstrong's web page for emailing proposed orders to the assigned judge. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
12 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Enns, Krista) Modified on 8/27/2018 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
11 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) Modified on 8/24/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
10 10 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re1 Notice of Removal, Notice Of Withdrawal Of Ground Of Removal (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
9 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/23/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
8 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/22/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
7 7 ERRATA re5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
5 5 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) Modified on 8/21/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court with jury demand (no process). Their case number is CGC-18-568826. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12594481). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Gramacy, Ryan) Modified on 8/15/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet