DiMartile v. Cuomo
Original Case: 1:20-cv-00859
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-02683 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 05, 2021 3:52 AM EST |
Amicus Curiae
Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Council of the Churches of Christ in the USA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Methodist Federation for Social Action
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Equal Partners in Faith
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Disciples Justice Action Network
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Disciples Center for Public Witness
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Covenant Network of Presbyterians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Bend The Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erie County Department of Health
|
|
Defendant
Mark C. Poloncarz
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Erie County Department of Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Empire State Development Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Mark C. Poloncarz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Letitia James
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Andrew M. Cuomo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jenna M. DiMartile
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
David Shamenda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Joe Durolek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Pamella Giglia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Justin G. Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/05/2021 3:44 AM EST |
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Andrew M. Cuomo, Empire State Development Corporation, Erie County Department of Health, Letitia James and Mark C. Poloncarz, FILED. [2907130] 20-2683 [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:26 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 25 pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/07/2020, RECEIVED.[2907133] 20-2683 [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:28 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Andrew M. Cuomo, Empire State Development Corporation, Erie County Department of Health, Letitia James and Mark C. Poloncarz, USCA receipt # ANYNDC-5201013, FILED.[2907135] 20-2683 [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:29 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2907136] 20-2683 [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:29 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |