DiMartile et al v. Cuomo et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glenn T Suddaby |
Referred: | Christian F Hummel |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00859 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 27, 2021 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant
Andrew M. Cuomo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Empire State Development Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erie County Department of Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Letitia James
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Poloncarz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin G. Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenna M. DiMartile
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Durolek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamella Giglia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Shamenda
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
69 | 69
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 10/17 12:21 PM
STATEMENT OF COSTS certified copy Issued on 10/17/2023 as to66 Notice of Appeal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that costs are taxed in the amount of $137.40 in favor of Appellees Empire State Development Corporation, Kathleen Hochul and Letitia James. (mgh) |
|
68 | 68
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 10/17 12:05 PM
MANDATE of USCA issued on 10/17/2023 as to66 Notice of Appeal(mgh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) USCA- Discussion/Conclusion re: Affirmation of District Court Judgment |