VEIKOS v. TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joshua D Wolson |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-04408 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Aug 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 08, 2021 5:03 AM EST |
Defendant
TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CATHRINE VEIKOS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
147 | 147
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 09/28 8:25 AM
USCA ORDER AS TO123 NOTICE OF APPEAL, FILED BY CATHRINE VEIKOS, THAT THE ABOVE MATTER IS DISMISSED. A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS ORDER IS ISSUED IN LIEU OF A FORMAL MANDATE. (amas) |
|
146 | 146
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/27 1:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CATHRINE VEIKOS. (UEBLER, JULIE) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
145 | 145
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/26 12:45 PM
NOTICE by CATHRINE VEIKOS REGARDING REMITTED DAMAGES AWARD (UEBLER, JULIE) |