Cathrine Veikos v. Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
Original Case: 2:20-cv-04408
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01992 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 28, 2023 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CATHRINE VEIKOS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/28/2023 4:40 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Cathrine Veikos in District Court No. 2-20-cv-04408. (LMR) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs CIVIL JUDGMENT | ||
17 pgs Appendix Citation Notice sent to Julie A. Uebler, Esq., Michael L. Banks, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/15/2023. (LMR) |