Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-27740

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William T Thurman
Case #: 2:20-ap-02117
Nature of Suit1 null
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2020
Terminated:Jan 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Amazon Web Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Amazon Web Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gil A. Miller, as Liquidating Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of SORENSON MEDIA, INC.
Rocky Mountain Advisory 215 South State Street Suite 550
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Patrick E Johnson
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, January 20, 2022
7 7 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Thu 01/20 10:21 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 01/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
6 6 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Judge's Order) (order) Tue 01/18 12:44 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (ksh)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Dismissal
court Dispose Adversary Case Tue 01/18 12:45 PM
Adversary Case 20-02117 Disposed. (ksh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
5 5 misc Pending Order Fri 01/14 3:10 PM
Pending Order Re:4 Notice of Dismissal. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 01/14 3:08 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Gil A. Miller. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
utility Remark Fri 09/03 1:47 PM
Remark. Order Approving Settlement Filed in Case 18-27740 See docket entry #713. (am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
utility Remark Thu 08/05 11:15 AM
Remark. Motion to Approve Settlement Filed in Case 18-27740 See docket entry #704. (am)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
3 3 misc Stipulation Tue 11/17 3:55 PM
Stipulation Regarding Deadline to Answer Complaint Filed by Gil A. Miller. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/23 2:59 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Amazon Web Services, Inc. / Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/16 8:55 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 20-02117 . Complaint by Gil A. Miller against Amazon Web Services, Inc. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+], 13, 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)]. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer