Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William T Thurman
Case #: 2:18-bk-27740
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2018
Terminated:Mar 23, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Jul 02, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sorenson Media, Inc.
25 E Scenic Pointe Dr Ste 100
Draper, UT 84020-6131
Represented By
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bank Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
John T. Morgan tr
Us Trustees Office
contact info


1. Sorenson Files Chapter 11 Bankruptcy To Escape Sinclair Deal (adexchanger.com)
Submitted Mon 10/22/2018
Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
728 728 misc Chapter 11 Quarterly Financial Report (Post Confirmation) Wed 04/13 11:01 AM
Quarterly Financial Report - Post Confirmation (Quarter 1 - 2022) Filed by Sorenson Media, Inc. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments to Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report