Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-27740

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William T Thurman
Case #: 2:20-ap-02121
Nature of Suit1 null
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2020
Terminated:Apr 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
TP Building I, LLC, a Utah limited liability company
Represented By
TP Building I, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sorenson Associates, The Pointe, LLC, a Utah limited liability company
Represented By
Sorenson Associates, The Pointe, LLC
contact info
Defendant
TP Building VI, LLC, a Utah limited liability company
Represented By
TP Building VI, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CA, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Represented By
CA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gil A. Miller, as Liquidating Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of SORENSON MEDIA, INC.
Rocky Mountain Advisory 215 South State Street Suite 550
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Patrick E Johnson
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 29, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 04/29 3:13 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Gil A. Miller. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Thu 04/29 3:25 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2121 Disposed. (ksh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/23 3:08 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: (i) TP Building I, LLC / Paul Ludlow Registered Agent; (ii) Sorenson Associates, The Pointe, LLC / Paul Ludlow, Registered Agent; (iii) TP Building VI, LLC / Paul Ludlow Registered Agent; and (iv) CA, Inc. / The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/16 9:14 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 20-02121 . Complaint by Gil A. Miller against TP Building I, LLC, Sorenson Associates, The Pointe, LLC, TP Building VI, LLC, CA, Inc. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+], 14, 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)]. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - other