Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-27740

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William T Thurman
Case #: 2:20-ap-02124
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2020
Terminated:Aug 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cisco Systems Capital Corp., a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Cisco Systems Capital Corp.
contact info
Defendant
De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Represented By
De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gil A. Miller, as Liquidating Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of SORENSON MEDIA, INC.
Rocky Mountain Advisory 215 South State Street Suite 550
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Patrick E Johnson
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, August 16, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 08/16 3:48 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Gil A. Miller. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Mon 08/16 4:24 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2124 Disposed. (ksh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
utility Remark Mon 07/12 3:01 PM
Remark: Settlement order has been entered into the main case 18-27740 as docket entry #693. (ksh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
utility Remark Thu 06/10 8:47 AM
Remark. Motion to Approve Settlement Filed in Case 18-27740 See docket entry #674. (am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
4 4 answer Response Thu 05/27 2:03 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Gil A. Miller. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-] Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
3 3 generic Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Wed 05/12 10:49 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Notice Date 05/12/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
order Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order) Mon 05/10 12:18 PM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 6/1/2021. (tjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/23 3:15 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: (i) Cisco Systems Capital Corp. / Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent; and (ii) De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. / The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc, Registered Agent. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/16 9:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 20-02124 . Complaint by Gil A. Miller against Cisco Systems Capital Corp. De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference