Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-27740

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William T Thurman
Case #: 2:20-ap-02129
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2020
Terminated:Mar 17, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Moelis & Co., LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By
Moelis & Co., LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gil A. Miller, as Liquidating Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of SORENSON MEDIA, INC.
Rocky Mountain Advisory 215 South State Street Suite 550
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Patrick E Johnson
Cohne Kinghorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
court Dispose Adversary Case Wed 03/17 9:47 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2129 Disposed. (fsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 03/16 4:25 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Gil A. Miller. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
utility Remark Fri 02/12 10:35 AM
Remark: Order Approving Settlement Filed in Case 18-27740 See docket entry #610. (am)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/23 3:31 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Moelis & Co, LLC / Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/16 9:43 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 20-02129 . Complaint by Gil A. Miller against Moelis & Co, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Johnson, Patrick)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference