Collins v. Bradley
Pennsylvania Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Malachy E Mannion |
Referred: | Db |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-02230 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2021 |
Petitioner
Sean Collins
|
|
Respondent
Eric Bradley
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal)
Tue 09/06 2:21 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sean Collins(Batts, Pam) |
|
Att: 1 Mandate Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Opinion | ||
Thursday, July 14, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Judgment (Use this if Mandate Will Follow)
Thu 07/14 2:06 PM
JUDGMENT of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sean Collins (King, James) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 10/08 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in Prisoner Case as to16 Order Dismissing Case,, by Sean Collins. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (sm) |
|
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order (Memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 09/23 12:35 PM
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; DISMISSING as moot7 MOTION to Certify Class/Appt Counsel; Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/23/21. (sm) |
|
15 | 15
14
pgs
order
Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry)
Thu 09/23 12:32 PM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sean Collins Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/23/21. (sm) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Traverse
Wed 02/03 3:48 PM
TRAVERSE by Sean Collins to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,12 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus. (ao) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 01/11 11:46 AM
ORDER 1.Petitioners motion for enlargement of time, (Doc. 11), is GRANTED in Part. 2.Petitioner may file his traverse on, or before, February 26, 2021. granting in part11 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/11/21 (bs) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus
Fri 01/08 3:37 PM
RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Eric Bradley by Eric Bradley.(Butler, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Unpublished Opinion(s) | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 01/08 1:53 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to To file reply to respondents' answer by Sean Collins.(sm) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 12/29 12:48 PM
ORDER granting9 respondent's Motion to Extend Time to resp. to petn. to h.c. Show Cause Response due by 1/8/2021. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/29/20 (bs) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 12/29 12:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Eric Bradley.(Butler, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Tue 12/22 11:08 AM
Letter dtd 12/18/20 (unsigned) RE: Covid release (ao) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
14
pgs
motion
Certify Class
Fri 12/18 12:41 PM
MOTION to Certify Class and appont class counsel by Sean Collins.(sm) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 12/08 2:05 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (See order for details). Show Cause Response due by 12/29/2020.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/8/20. (bs) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Mon 12/07 3:26 PM
Letter from Michael Grasso, Re: Recent developments at USP Canaan due to Covid 19 breakout. (ga) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received (Receipt)
Wed 12/02 9:37 AM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333073972 (dw) |
|
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Wed 12/02 4:09 PM
Receipt of payment from sean collins in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 12/1/2020. Receipt number 333073972 processed by smurphy. (jjs) |
||
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Pro Se Letter Issued
Tue 12/01 2:34 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lp) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Consent | ||
2 | 2
30+
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Law
Tue 12/01 2:18 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Sean Collins. (lp) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 12/01 2:16 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 333), filed by Sean Collins.(lp) |