Los Angeles Unified School District v. A.O.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00757 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 28:7422 Appeal from Administrative Decision |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2021 |
Re-opened: | May 03, 2024 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 26, 2021 2:41 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
A.O.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Los Angeles Unified School District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
A.O.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Los Angeles Unified School District
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
98 | 98
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 08/30 1:53 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David M Grey counsel for Counter Claimant A.O., Defendant A.O.. Adding David M. Grey as counsel of record for A.O. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant A.O.. (Attorney David M Grey added to party A.O.(pty:cc), Attorney David M Grey added to party A.O.(pty:dft))(Grey, David) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
97 | 97
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Wed 08/28 9:36 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,61 filed by A.O., Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,59 filed by Los Angeles Unified School District. CCA # 22-55204 22-55226 Upon consideration of plaintiff-appellant's motion to remand all attorney fee issues to the district court, the motion is GRANTED. The defendant- appellee's fee petition is not limited to the appeals. Accordingly, defendant-appellee's petition for attorney fees is hereby REMANDED to the district court for appropriate proceedings consistent with this court's decision on the merits. (mat) |