Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-00773
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 17, 2021
Terminated:Dec 30, 2021
Case in other court:California Central, 2:21-cv-03696
Last checked: Saturday Nov 13, 2021 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
ANAND AGNESHWAR
Arnold & Porter Llp - New York Ny
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
LUKE A CONNELLY
Winston & Strawn Llp - New York Ny
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
LUKE A CONNELLY
Winston & Strawn Llp - New York Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
HESHAM MAGID
Represented By
Elliot S Blut
Blut Law Group Apc
contact info
ELLIOT STEPHEN BLUT
Blut Law Group Apc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 30, 2021
24 24 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/30 3:10 PM
ORDER - This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the Plaintiff's failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/30/2021. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 12/29 2:14 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:23 Order to Show Cause, (no response filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
23 23 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 12/14 4:21 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with orders of the Court, by 12/28/2021 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/14/2021. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 09/30 7:38 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:22 DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S NONCOMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURTS JULY 26, 2021 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORT ON SPECIFIC CAUSATION (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
22 22 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/29 3:55 PM
NOTICE Notice of Plaintiff's Noncompliance with this Court's July 26, 2021 Order Regarding Plaintiff's Expert Report on Specific Causation by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD re21 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (AGNESHWAR, ANAND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 77 pgs Appendix Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures
Monday, July 26, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/26 2:29 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff must produce an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) to Defendants by Friday, September 24, 2021 . By September 29, 2021 , Defendants must advise the Court of whether Plaintiff timely produced an appropriate expert report. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/26/2021. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
20 20 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 07/06 3:17 PM
NOTICE Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Form by HESHAM MAGID (BLUT, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 07/06 3:12 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff Profile Form by HESHAM MAGID (BLUT, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/06 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELLIOT STEPHEN BLUT on behalf of HESHAM MAGID (BLUT, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 05/18 11:27 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:16 Case Transferred In - District Transfer,1 Complaint (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
17 17 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 05/17 4:13 PM
NOTICE Regarding Attorney Admission and #1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement. (emailed to counsel, Elliot Blut) (djb)
Related: [-]
16 16 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 05/17 3:56 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-03696. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/17 1:16 PM
Conditional Transfer Order - 33 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2734, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
14 14 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Hesham Magid, upon Defendant Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Blut, Elliot) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
13 13 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Hesham Magid, upon Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Blut, Elliot) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
12 12 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Hesham Magid, upon Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Blut, Elliot) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
11 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
10 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-03696-AB-MAAx. (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
9 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Hesham Magid. (Blut, Elliot) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hesham Magid, (Blut, Elliot) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Hesham Magid. (Blut, Elliot) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hesham Magid. (Blut, Elliot) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: CCACDC-31216139 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Hesham Magid. (Attorney Elliot S Blut added to party Hesham Magid(pty:pla))(Blut, Elliot) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2021.]
Related: [-]