Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:21-ap-01035
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 18, 2021
Terminated:Apr 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc.
23 Cranberry Lane
Middleton, MA 01949
Represented By
F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 21, 2022
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 04/21 8:57 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 21-01035 Dismiss Complaint (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/21 8:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1035 Closed (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
28 28 misc Stipulation Tue 04/05 2:30 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff John O. Desmond and F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc. of Dismissal with Prejudice with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
27 27 court Entry Fri 02/18 2:57 PM
Motion to Compromise filed in Main Case # 19-11824 Document # 352. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Document Mon 02/07 8:50 AM
Order dated 2/7/2022 Re:25 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Withdraw Document and Cancel Hearing Re:15 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Compel Defendant's Responses to Discovery Requests. GRANTED: THE MOTION OF JOHN O. DESMOND TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS [#15] IS DEEMED WITHDRAWN; AND THE 2/8/2022 HEARING ON THE MOTION IS CANCELED. (sl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
25 25 motion Withdraw Document Fri 02/04 2:58 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Withdraw Document and Cancel Hearing [Re:15 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Compel Defendant's Responses to Discovery Requests with certificate of service.] with certificate of service. (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/22 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Amend
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Wed 01/19 9:06 AM
Endorsed Order dated 1/19/2022 Re:22 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Amend [Re:5 Pre-Trial Order,10 Order on Motion for Approval,13 Order on Motion to Amend] GRANTED: THE DEADLINES ARE HEREBY EXTENDED AS PROPOSED. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
22 22 motion Amend Tue 01/18 3:22 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Amend [Re:5 Pre-Trial Order,10 Order on Motion for Approval,13 Order on Motion to Amend] with certificate of service. (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 15, 2022
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sun 01/16 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Hearing Scheduled
Thursday, January 13, 2022
20 20 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Thu 01/13 2:28 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Compel
Att: 1 Notice of Telephonic Nonevidentiary Hearing
19 19 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Thu 01/13 1:05 PM
TELEPHONIC Hearing Scheduled for 2/8/2022 at 10:00 AM Re:15 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Compel Defendant's Responses to Discovery Requests. BECAUSE OF THE CONCERNS ABOUT COVID-19, ALL PARTICIPANTS, INCLUDING ATTORNEYS, THE DEBTOR(S), WITNESSES, AFFIANTS, AND OTHER ATTENDEES SHALL APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AND MAY NOT APPEAR IN PERSON. TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY, ATTENDEES SHALL, AT THE APPOINTED TIME OF HEARING, DIAL (877) 336-1839 AND ENTER ACCESS CODE 7925100. TO FACILITATE INFORMAL DISCUSSIONS SIMILAR TO THOSE THAT OCCUR JUST PRIOR TO IN-PERSON HEARINGS, THE COURT REQUESTS THAT THE PARTIES ATTEMPT TO CONFER BRIEFLY 48 HOURS PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED HEARING. (mem)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
18 18 answer Opposition Mon 01/10 10:30 AM
Opposition with certificate of service filed by Defendant F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc. Re:15 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Compel Defendant's Responses to Discovery Requests with certificate of service. (Weinberg, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
17 17 utility Corrective Entry Thu 01/06 3:58 PM
Order Requiring Corrective Action. You are hereby ORDERED to file the required document(s) identified in the attached order within (2) business days of the date of this order Related [+] (lb)
Related: [-] 16 Opposition filed by Defendant F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc.
16 16 answer Opposition Thu 01/06 3:23 PM
DISREGARD. Opposition with certificate of service filed by Defendant F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc. Re:15 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Compel Defendant's Responses to Discovery Requests with certificate of service. (Jacob, Bill) CORRCTIVE ENTRY: ECF Filer and Signature Do Not Match. Two Day Order Issued to Refile. Modified on 1/6/2022 (lb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
15 15 motion Compel Thu 12/23 12:53 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Compel Defendant's Responses to Discovery Requests with certificate of service. (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Saturday, November 20, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 11/21 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/20/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Amend
Thursday, November 18, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Thu 11/18 9:28 AM
Endorsed Order dated 11/18/2021 Re:12 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Amend [Re:5 Pre-Trial Order, 10 Order on Motion for Approval] GRANTED. THE DEADLINES ARE HEREBY EXTENDED AS PROPOSED. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
12 12 motion Amend Wed 11/17 12:53 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Amend [Re:5 Pre-Trial Order,10 Order on Motion for Approval] with certificate of service. (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 07/31 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Approval
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Wed 07/28 9:16 AM
Endorsed Order dated 7/28/2021 Re:9 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Approve [Re:8 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference] GRANTED. THE PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN IS APPROVED, AND THE DEADLINES IN THE PRETRIAL ORDER ARE MODIFIED ACCORDINGLY. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
9 9 motion Approve Tue 07/27 4:14 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Approve [Re:8 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference] with certificate of service. (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Tue 07/27 4:13 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
7 7 misc Statement Wed 06/30 2:06 PM
Statement of Compliance with Scheduling and Pretrial Order with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 06/26 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/25/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Pre-Trial Order
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
5 5 order Pre-Trial Order Wed 06/23 4:24 PM
Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order dated 6/23/2021 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 10/21/2021. Discovery due by 9/21/2021. See Order for full text. (ymw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/17 3:34 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc.. (Weinberg, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/21 1:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc. 5/19/2021 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 05/19 10:42 AM
Summons Issued on F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc. Answer Due 6/18/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/18 6:10 PM
Adversary case 21-01035 Complaint by John O. Desmond against F. Murphy & Sons Cleaning Co., Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]