Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:21-ap-01038
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 19, 2021
Terminated:Nov 10, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Five Star Kosher LLC
1085 East 3rd Street
Brooklyn, NY 11230
Represented By
Five Star Kosher LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
5 Edgell Rd. Ste.30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 11/10 11:37 AM
Disposition of Adversary Number 21-1038 Granting Complaint. (ymw)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/10 11:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1038 Closed. (ymw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/29 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Default Judgment
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/29 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Default Judgment Tue 10/26 11:35 AM
Default Judgment dated 10/26/2021. THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING HAVING COME ON FOR CONSIDERATION ON THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; THE DEFENDANT HAVING FAILED TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT AND TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; THE PLAINTIFF HAVING STATED IN THE COMPLAINT A VALID CLAIM FOR THE RELIEF HE SEEKS; AND, THEREFORE, THE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN GRANTED, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT THE PLAINTIFF, JOHN O. DESMOND, AS HE IS TRUSTEE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED BANKRUPTCY CASE, RECOVER FROM THE DEFENDANT, FIVE STAR KOSHER LLC, THE SUM OF $10,464.38, PLUS INTEREST THEREON AT THE STATUTORY RATE OF 0.11 PERCENT PER ANNUM FROM OCTOBER 14, 2019, THE TRUSTEE'S DATE OF DEMAND. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 10/26 11:33 AM
Endorsed Order dated 10/26/2021 Re:8 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond for Default Judgment on Defendant(s) Five Star Kosher LLC. NO RESPONSE HAVING BEEN FILED, AND GOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN STATED, DEFAULT JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER AS REQUESTED. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
8 8 motion Default Judgment Fri 10/01 1:04 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond for Default Judgment on Defendant(s) Five Star Kosher LLC with certificate of service (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 09/23 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/22/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order
Monday, September 20, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 09/20 4:41 PM
Order dated 09/20/2021 Related [+]. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON JUNE 22, 2021, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 12, 2021, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 21-01038 Complaint by John O. Desmond against Five Star Kosher LLC.
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 06/22 1:01 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Five Star Kosher LLC (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 06/22 12:59 PM
DISREGARD Clerk's Entry of Default as to Five Star Kosher LLC (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/21 1:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on Five Star Kosher LLC 5/19/2021 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 05/19 1:22 PM
Summons Issued on Five Star Kosher LLC Answer Due 6/18/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/19 12:53 PM
Adversary case 21-01038 Complaint by John O. Desmond against Five Star Kosher LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]