Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:21-ap-01040
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 20, 2021
Terminated:Sep 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fox Trucking Inc.
29920 Dover Road
Easton, MD 21601
Represented By
Fox Trucking Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Zachary Gregoricus
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 24, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 09/24 8:20 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 21-01040 Complaint Dismissed (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/24 8:20 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1040 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/09 1:55 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond, Defendant Fox Trucking Inc. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
court Entry Tue 09/07 11:29 AM
Order Granting Motion to Compromise in Main case 19-11824 by Document #243. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
8 8 misc Statement Wed 06/30 2:24 PM
Statement of Compliance with Scheduling and Pretrial Order with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
7 7 notice Notice Tue 06/29 2:29 PM
Confirmation of Conference Regarding Duty to Preserve Evidence with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Defendant Fox Trucking Inc. (Mattera, Alex)
Related: [-] 5 Pre-Trial Order
Saturday, June 26, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 06/27 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Pre-Trial Order
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
5 5 order Pre-Trial Order Thu 06/24 9:00 AM
Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order dated 6/23/2021 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond. See Order for Full Text. (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
4 4 answer Response Mon 06/21 1:28 PM
Answer with certificate of service filed by Defendant Fox Trucking Inc. Re:1 Adversary case 21-01040 Complaint by John O. Desmond against Fox Trucking Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),2 Summons Issued on Fox Trucking Inc. Answer Due 6/21/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Mattera, Alex)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/21 2:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fox Trucking Inc. 5/21/2021 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 05/20 11:18 AM
Summons Issued on Fox Trucking Inc. Answer Due 6/21/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/20 6:41 AM
Adversary case 21-01040 Complaint by John O. Desmond against Fox Trucking Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]