Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:21-ap-01049
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 24, 2021
Terminated:Sep 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
McMaster-Carr Supply Company
600 N. County Line Road
Elmhurst, IL 60126
Represented By
McMaster-Carr Supply Company
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Zachary Gregoricus
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 24, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 09/24 8:26 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 21-01049 Complaint Dismissed (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/24 8:27 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1049 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
9 9 notice Notice Thu 09/09 11:01 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice Thu 09/09 10:58 AM
DISREGARD: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond. (Horne, Jonathan) Disregard. Docketed in this case in error. Modified on 9/9/2021 (ymw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
court Entry Tue 09/07 11:34 AM
Order Granting Motion to Compromise in Main case 19-11824 by Document #245. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 07/21 1:47 PM
Endorsed Order dated 7/21/2021 Re:6 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer Re:1 Complaint. GRANTED: THE TIME IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO OCTOBER 21, 2021. (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
6 6 motion Extend Time Tue 07/20 4:06 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Extend Time to Answer [Re:1 Complaint] with certificate of service. (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Thu 06/24 9:16 AM
Order dated 6/24/2021 Re:4 Emergency Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Approve Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Re:1 Complaint. GRANTED. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED, AND THE TIME TO ANSWER IS EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING JULY 23, 2021. (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
4 4 motion Extend Time Wed 06/23 4:30 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Approve Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint [Re:1 Complaint] with certificate of service. (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/25 1:26 PM
Summons Service Executed on McMaster-Carr Supply Company 5/25/2021 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 05/25 10:31 AM
Summons Issued on McMaster-Carr Supply Company Answer Due 6/24/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/24 5:18 PM
Adversary case 21-01049 Complaint by John O. Desmond against McMaster-Carr Supply Company. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]