Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:21-ap-01050
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 24, 2021
Terminated:Aug 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Melanson, P.C.
9 Executive Park Drive, Suite 100
Merrimack, NH 93954
Represented By
Melanson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Zachary Gregoricus
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 08/24 9:49 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 21-01050 Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/24 9:49 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1050 Closed. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
5 5 notice Notice Fri 08/06 1:53 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 06/25 10:02 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Melanson, P.C. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/25 1:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Melanson, P.C. 5/25/2021 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 05/25 10:34 AM
Summons Issued on Melanson, P.C. Answer Due 6/24/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/24 5:21 PM
Adversary case 21-01050 Complaint by John O. Desmond against Melanson, P.C.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]