Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:21-ap-01054
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 24, 2021
Terminated:Sep 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Spirit Transportation, Inc.
6 Barnes Circle
Salem, MA 01970
Represented By
Spirit Transportation, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info
Zachary Gregoricus
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 24, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 09/24 8:28 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 21-01054 Complaint Dismissed (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/24 8:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1054 Closed (jreg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/09 1:55 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond, Defendant Spirit Transportation, Inc. (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
court Entry Tue 09/07 11:35 AM
Order Granting Motion to Compromise in Main case 19-11824 by Document #246. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/21 1:54 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Spirit Transportation, Inc.. (Mattera, Alex)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/25 1:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Spirit Transportation, Inc. 5/25/2021 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 05/25 11:13 AM
Summons Issued on Spirit Transportation, Inc. Answer Due 6/24/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/24 5:35 PM
Adversary case 21-01054 Complaint by John O. Desmond against Spirit Transportation, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]