Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11824

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:21-ap-01061
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 27, 2021
Terminated:Dec 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
A & V Temps Inc.
210 Broadway
Chelsea, MA 02150
Represented By
A & V Temps Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John O. Desmond
5 Edgell Road, Suite 30A
Framingham, MA 01701
Represented By
Zachary Gregoricus
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info
Jonathan Horne
Murtha Cullina LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, December 03, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 12/03 3:54 PM
Disposition of Adversary Number 21-01061 Stipulation of Dismissal of Complaint. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/03 3:55 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1061 Closed . (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 11/18 1:53 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff John O. Desmond and A & V Temps Inc. of Dismissal with Prejudice with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
court Entry Thu 10/14 2:30 PM
Motion to Compromise filed in Main Case No. 19-11824 Document #266. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 25, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 07/26 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/25/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion for Approval
Thursday, July 22, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Fri 07/23 8:58 AM
Order dated 7/22/2021 Re:10 Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Approve Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. GRANTED. THE PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN IS APPROVED, AND THE DEADLINES IN THE PRETRIAL ORDER ARE MODIFIED ACCORDINGLY. (jreg)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Approve Thu 07/22 9:24 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond to Approve [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference] with certificate of service. (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Thu 07/22 9:23 AM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
8 8 misc Statement Tue 07/06 3:18 PM
Statement of Compliance with Scheduling and Pretrial Order with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond (Gregoricus, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Compliance/Non Compliance Thu 07/01 9:48 AM
Certificate of Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(e) with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Defendant A & V Temps Inc. (MacDonald, Donald)
Related: [-] 5 Pre-Trial Order
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 07/01 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Pre-Trial Order
Monday, June 28, 2021
5 5 order Pre-Trial Order Mon 06/28 1:10 PM
Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order dated 6/28/2021 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John O. Desmond. See Order for Full Text. (bhendry, usbc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 26, 2021
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Sat 06/26 4:48 PM
Answer to Complaint of John O. Desmond, Ch. 7 Trustee with certificate of service filed by A & V Temps Inc.. (MacDonald, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/01 2:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on A & V Temps Inc. 6/1/2021 (Horne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 05/28 9:28 AM
Summons Issued on A & V Temps Inc. Answer Due 6/28/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/27 6:57 PM
Adversary case 21-01061 Complaint by John O. Desmond against A & V Temps Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Desmond, John)
Related: [-]