Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00487 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 30, 2021 3:42 AM CST |
Counter Defendant
The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Patricia I. Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
W. J. Rankin
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Dorothy McCleod MacInerney
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Paul W. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Jim E. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Howard W. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Paul A. Ehlert
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Richard Dickson
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Greg A. Bridges
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Blue Bell Creameries, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Blue Bell Creameries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
John W. Barnhill, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patricia I. Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
W. J. Rankin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dorothy McCleod MacInerney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul W. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jim E. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Howard W. Kruse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul A. Ehlert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Dickson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Greg A. Bridges
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blue Bell Creameries, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blue Bell Creameries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John W. Barnhill, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Wed 08/02 1:21 PM
Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming the decision of the District Court as to44 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed), filed by Patricia I. Ryan, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., W. J. Rankin, Howard W. Kruse, Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Jim E. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, Paul W. Kruse, Greg A. Bridges, Paul A. Ehlert, Richard Dickson, John W. Barnhill, Jr. ORDER that each party to bear own costspay to the costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of this Court.(klw) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
USCA Order (NOT Judgment/Mandate)
Mon 12/19 10:24 AM
ORDER of USCA GRANTINTG Plaintiffs' Motion for access to SEALED documents re: Notice of Appeal. (klw) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically
Tue 10/04 7:51 AM
Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions[LINK:here] (klw) |
||
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 09/20 2:35 PM
Appeal of Final Judgment42 ,43 by John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Greg A. Bridges, Richard Dickson, Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number ATXWDC-16545491) (Daniels, Douglas) |
|
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 09/21 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL following44 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed), by John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Greg A. Bridges, Richard Dickson, Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ATXWDC-16545491. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out a[LINK:(Transcript Order)] and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (klw) |
||
Monday, August 22, 2022 | ||
43 | 43
order
Judgment
Mon 08/22 5:00 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) |
|
42 | 42
16
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 08/22 4:58 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART30 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) |
|
Friday, February 04, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 02/04 4:07 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Plaintiff The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
40 | 40
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 02/04 3:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Greg A. Bridges, Richard Dickson, Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan, re32 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Patricia I. Ryan, Defendant Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Defendant Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Defendant W. J. Rankin, Defendant Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Defendant Jim E. Kruse, Defendant Howard W. Kruse, Defendant Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, Defendant Paul A. Ehlert, Defendant Paul W. Kruse, Defendant John W. Barnhill, Jr. (Daniels, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, January 26, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/26 7:27 AM
Text Order GRANTING39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Jeff J. Bowen. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) |
||
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 01/24 12:47 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas A. Daniels on behalf of Jeff J. Bowen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15640825) by on behalf of John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Greg A. Bridges, Richard Dickson, Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan.(Daniels, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
38 | 38
misc
Pro Hac Vice Letter
Mon 01/24 9:00 AM
Clerk's Office letter to Attorney Jeff Bowen re: non-admitted status. (lt) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
Mon 01/24 12:04 PM
Text Order GRANTING36 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiffs' Unredacted Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, (Dkt. 36-1), under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mplc) |
||
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Response
Fri 01/21 5:20 PM
RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Sealed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment to34 Sealed Document by John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Greg A. Bridges, Richard Dickson, Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan. (Daniels, Douglas) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
Fri 01/21 2:48 PM
Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Sealed Document, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
35 | 35
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 01/21 2:44 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, re32 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Patricia I. Ryan, Defendant Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Defendant Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Defendant W. J. Rankin, Defendant Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Defendant Jim E. Kruse, Defendant Howard W. Kruse, Defendant Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, Defendant Paul A. Ehlert, Defendant Paul W. Kruse, Defendant John W. Barnhill, Jr. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Monday, December 13, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 12/13 1:59 PM
Plaintiffs' Sealed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (dm) |
|
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
Mon 12/13 1:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING31 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) |
|
Friday, December 10, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 12/10 4:51 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan. (Daniels, Douglas) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
Fri 12/10 4:46 PM
Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Pltfs Unredacted Cross MSJ, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
30 | 30
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 12/10 4:35 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut.(Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Redacted Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 09, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Sealed Document
Thu 12/09 3:19 PM
Sealed Verified Stockholder Derivative Action Complaint filed. (dm) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
Thu 12/09 10:44 AM
Text Order GRANTING28 Joint Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the attached Exhibit, the unredacted Underlying Complaint, (Dkt. 28-1), under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mplc) |
||
Wednesday, December 08, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
Wed 12/08 3:02 PM
Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Daniels, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Sealed Document Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Wed 12/08 12:53 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation re: Policies by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut.(Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 10/12 3:06 PM
ORDER ENTERING Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Staying of All Other Deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/01 5:34 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of a Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Stay of All Other Deadlines by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
order
Protective Order
Tue 09/28 2:48 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) |
|
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Protective Order
Mon 09/27 4:25 PM
Proposed Protective Order by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan
Mon 09/27 4:23 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 Report by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 09/10 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy Wilson Burns (Burns, Timothy) |
|
Friday, August 27, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 08/27 9:16 AM
ANSWER to16 Answer to Complaint,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, Plaintiffs' Original Answer and Defenses to Defendants' Counterclaim by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut.(Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, August 19, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 08/19 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesse Jonas Bair on behalf of John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Greg A. Bridges, Richard Dickson, Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan. Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party John W. Barnhill, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Blue Bell Creameries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Blue Bell Creameries, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Greg A. Bridges(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Richard Dickson(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Paul A. Ehlert(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Howard W. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Jim E. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Paul W. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Dorothy McCleod MacInerney(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party W. J. Rankin(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse Jonas Bair added to party Patricia I. Ryan(pty:dft) (Bair, Jesse) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 08/19 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Wilson Burns on behalf of John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Greg A. Bridges, Richard Dickson, Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan. Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party John W. Barnhill, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Blue Bell Creameries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Blue Bell Creameries, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Greg A. Bridges(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Richard Dickson(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Paul A. Ehlert(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Howard W. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Jim E. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Paul W. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Dorothy McCleod MacInerney(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party W. J. Rankin(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Wilson Burns added to party Patricia I. Ryan(pty:dft) (Burns, Timothy) |
|
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 08/06 11:02 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by John W. Barnhill, Jr, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, Inc., Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Greg A. Bridges, Richard Dickson, Paul A. Ehlert, Howard W. Kruse, Jim E. Kruse, Paul W. Kruse, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan. (Daniels, Douglas) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 08/06 10:41 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party John W. Barnhill, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Blue Bell Creameries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Blue Bell Creameries, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Greg A. Bridges(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Richard Dickson(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Paul A. Ehlert(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Howard W. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Jim E. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Paul W. Kruse(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Dorothy McCleod MacInerney(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party W. J. Rankin(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Patricia I. Ryan(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by John W. Barnhill, Jr, Paul W. Kruse, Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc., Greg A. Bridges, Paul A. Ehlert, W. J. Rankin, Patricia I. Ryan, Dorothy McCleod MacInerney, Richard Dickson, Blue Bell Creameries, L.P., Jim E. Kruse, Howard W. Kruse, Blue Bell Creameries, Inc..(Daniels, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to W. J. Rankin. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Patricia I. Ryan. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Paul W. Kruse. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Jim E. Kruse. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Howard W. Kruse. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Paul A. Ehlert. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Richard Dickson. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Dorothy McCleod MacInerney. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Greg A. Bridges. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Blue Bell Creameries USA, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Blue Bell Creameries, L.P.. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Blue Bell Creameries, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/15 2:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to John W. Barnhill, Jr. Waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Thu 06/03 3:17 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Ervin, Courtney) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/03 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14874486). No Summons requested at this time, filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Ervin, Courtney) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 6/3/2021) (cj) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/03 4:27 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) |
||
misc
To be Referred to AU Mag Judge
Thu 06/03 4:27 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 06/03 4:28 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (cj) |