Pizza Hut, LLC v. Pandya et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-00089 |
Nature of Suit | 196 Contract - Franchise |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 17, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 08, 2021 10:20 PM CDT |
Counter Claimant
8 New Britain Pizza LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Ronak Roods LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
JNP Foods, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Pandya Restaurants LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Jignesh N. Pandya
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Pizza Hut LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronak Roods LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pandya Restaurants LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jignesh N. Pandya
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JNP Foods, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
8 New Britain Pizza LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Ronak Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Hon. Jeff Kaplan
jstephens@jamsadr.com JAMS 8401 North Central Expressway Suite 610
Dallas, TX 75225 |
|
Plaintiff
Pizza Hut LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Ronak Pandya
Terminated: 10/09/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
492 | 492
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Fri 02/23 9:35 AM
ORDER granting491 MOTION to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record filed by Pizza Hut LLC. It is ORDERED that Joel Bailey is withdrawn as counsel of record for Pizza Hut. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all CM/ECF notifications to Joel Bailey for this matter. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/23/2024. (slo) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
491 | 491
motion
Withdraw
Fri 02/16 2:35 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record by Pizza Hut LLC.(Culbertson, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |