Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:21-cv-02602
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2021
Terminated:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 26, 2022 5:35 AM CDT
Defendant
FedEx Company
Defendant
Fredrick W. Smith
Defendant
Babita Tiwari
Plaintiff
Akash Dixit

GPO Feb 13 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON 21 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND 44 SECOND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 2/13/2023. (mpk)
GPO May 19 2023
ORDER Adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation on Outstanding Motions signed by Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr. on 05/19/2023. (Fowlkes, J.)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
79 79 appeal USCA Order Fri 02/21 12:11 PM
ORDER of USCA as to67 Notice of Appeal filed by Akash Dixit. ORDER filed: As proceedings in Case No. 23-5595 are complete, the abeyance is LIFTED. A briefing schedule will issue by separate letter. (jae)
Related: [-]