Original Case: 2:21-cv-02602

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-05595
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:Oct 25, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Oct 26, 2023 6:11 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
FREDRICK W. SMITH
Represented By
Thomas Whitelaw Murrey Jr.
FedEx Corporation
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BABITA TIWARI
Represented By
Thomas Whitelaw Murrey Jr.
FedEx Corporation
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TANYA SINGH
Represented By
Tanya Singh
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KARAN SINGH
Represented By
Karan Singh
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY D. GOLDEN
Defendant - Appellee
KUPFERMAN & GOLDEN
Defendant - Appellee
GOLDEN FIRM
Defendant - Appellee
FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION
Represented By
Thomas Whitelaw Murrey Jr.
FedEx Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AKASH DIXIT
Represented By
Akash Dixit
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/26/2023 6:11 AM CDT
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Akash Dixit. Transcript needed: n. (CAM)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Whitelaw Murrey, Jr. for Appellees Federal Express Corporation, Fredrick W. Smith and Babita Tiwari Certificate of Service: 06/28/2023. 23-5595 (TWM)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Federal Express Corporation, Fredrick W. Smith and Babita Tiwari by Thomas W. Murrey, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 06/28/2023. 23-5595 (TWM)
Related: [-]