Black Emergency Response Team et al v. OConnor et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Charles Goodwin |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-01022 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 17, 2022 3:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
Natalie Shirley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anita Holloway
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ann Holloway
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lee Ann Kuhlman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Monies
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rick Nagel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John OConnor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Parker, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack Sherry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Keating
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trent Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric Stevenson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Stitt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Turpen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jamie Underwood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Courtney Warmington
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathleen Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phil Albert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cynthia Benson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Bobek
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carlisha Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dennis Casey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Cawley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joy Hofmeister
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Flanagan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angela Grunewald
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jay Helm
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Estela Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Hickman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oklahoma State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Precious Lloyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regan Killackey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Black Emergency Response Team
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Indian Movement Indian Territory
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
University of Oklahoma Chapter of the American Association of University Professors
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
213 | 213
respm
Response to Non - Motion
Thu 09/12 12:45 PM
RESPONSE re211 Notice (other),,212 Order,, filed by Gentner Drummond, Ryan Walters, Donald Burdick, Sarah Lepak, Kendra Wesson, Kevin Stitt, Jeffrey Hickman, Michael Turpen, Steven Taylor, Dennis Casey, Dustin Hilliary, P Mitchell Adwon, Jr, Jack Sherry, Courtney Warmington, Katie Quebedeaux.(Gaskins, Garry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -Order Revoking Teaching Certificate | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
212 | 212
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/05 4:49 PM
ORDER. Defendant Ryan Walters, in his official capacity as Oklahoma Superintendent of Public Education, and Defendants Zachary Archer, Donald Burdick, Sarah Lepak, Katie Quebedeaux, and Kendra Wesson, in their official capacities as members of the Oklahoma State Board of Education, are DIRECTED to file a written response to Plaintiffs' Notice (Doc. No.211 ) within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Order. Defendants shall attach to their Response (under seal if appropriate) a copy of the revocation order, a copy of the relevant minutes of the August 22, 2024 Board meeting, and any other documents necessary for the Court to consider this matter. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 09/05/2024. (jb) |