Black Emergency Response Team, et al v. Drummond, et al
Original Case: 5:21-cv-01022
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-06141 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 18, 2024 2:30 AM MDT |
Defendant
KATHLEEN DUNCAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TRENT SMITH, in his official capacities as a member of the Oklahoma State Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ANN HOLLOWAY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT ROSS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FRANK KEATING
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RICK BRAUGHT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATALIE SHIRLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ERIC STEVENSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ANITA HOLLOWAY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RICK NAGEL, in his official capacities as members of the Board of Regents of the University of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ANGELA GRUNEWALD, in her official capacity as the Superintendent of Edmond Public Schools
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAMIE UNDERWOOD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CYNTHIA BENSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SUZANNE REYNOLDS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEE ANN KUHLMAN, in her official capacities as a member of the Board of Education of Edmond Public Schools
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 12 OF OKLAHOMA COUNTY OKLAHOMA, AKA Edmond Public Schools
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM FLANAGAN
|
|
Defendant
CARLISHA BRADLEY
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER MONIES
|
|
Defendant
ESTELA HERNANDEZ
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN BOBEK
|
|
Defendant
JAY HELM
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH PARKER, JR.
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL CRAWLEY
|
|
Defendant
PHIL ALBERT
|
|
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF OKLAHOMA BOARD OF REGENTS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARLA HILL
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
JEFFREY HICKMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
GENTER DRUMMOND
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
RYAN WALTERS, in his official capacity as Oklahoma Superintendent of Public Instruction
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DONALD BURDICK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SARAH LEPAK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
KENDRA WESSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
KEVIN STITT, in his official capacity as Governor of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
STEVEN TAYLOR
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DENNIS CASEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DUSTIN HILLIARY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
P. MITCHELL ADWON, JR., in his official capacity as a member of the Oklahoma State Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JACK SHERRY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
COURTNEY WARMINGTON, in her official capacities as the Oklahoma State Regents for Higher Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
KATIE QUEBEDEAUX, in her official capacity as a member of the Oklahoma State Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
KEN LEVIT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MICHAEL TURPEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ZACHARY ARCHER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BLACK EMERGENCY RESPONSE TEAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
REGAN KILLACKEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANTHONY CRAWFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PRECIOUS LLOYD, as next friend of S.L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
AMERICAN INDIAN MOVEMENT INDIAN TERRITORY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
OKLAHOMA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNIVERSITY OF OKLAHOMA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/18/2024 2:30 AM MDT |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
[11105038] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2024 Docketing statement, Filing Fee, and Transcript order form due 07/30/2024 for P. Mitchell Adwon Jr., Donald Burdick, Dennis Casey, Genter Drummond, Jeffrey Hickman, Dustin Hilliary, Sarah Lepak, Ken Levit, Katie Quebedeaux, Jack Sherry, Kevin Stitt, Steven Taylor, Michael Turpen, Ryan Walters, Courtney Warmington and Kendra Wesson. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2024 for P. Mitchell Adwon Jr., American Indian Movement Indian Territory, Black Emergency Response Team, Donald Burdick, Dennis Casey, Anthony Crawford, Genter Drummond, Jeffrey Hickman, Dustin Hilliary, Independent School District No. 12 of Oklahoma County Oklahoma, Regan Killackey, Sarah Lepak, Ken Levit, Precious Lloyd, Oklahoma State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Katie Quebedeaux, Jack Sherry, Kevin Stitt, Steven Taylor, Michael Turpen, University of Oklahoma Chapter of the American Association of University Professors, Ryan Walters, Courtney Warmington, and Kendra Wesson. 24-6141 --[Edited 07/16/2024 by AT to add text that filing fee is due 07/30/2024 for the appellants. ] | ||
Att: 1 112 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |