Caceres v. Preload L L C
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Cain, Jr |
Referred: | Kathleen Kay |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03834 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | 14th Judicial District Court, 21-04001 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 30, 2022 4:55 AM CDT |
Defendant
Preload L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edilberto Caceres
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, December 11, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Judgment
Tue 12/12 1:24 PM
USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (certified copy) as to32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edilberto Caceres that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (USCA 23-30354 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appellant pay to Appellee the costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of this Court. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified to USCA
Tue 06/13 2:00 PM
ELECTRONICALLY CERTIFIED Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re32 Notice of Appeal, is now available to Appellate Counsel via the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals website. See Instructions for Access and Use of the Electronic Record Download Feature of CM/ECF by clicking[LINK:here] . (USCA 23-30354 If you do not have access to the Electronic Download Feature of CM/ECF, please submit your request for the certified record on appeal to the District Court. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 06/01 11:47 AM
USCA Case Number 23-30354 for32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edilberto Caceres. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
||
appeal
~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines
Thu 06/01 11:50 AM
Set Deadline for Clerk re32 Notice of Appeal: Certify Appeal Record 23-30354 by Clerk to COA 6/16/2023. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 05/22 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to30 Memorandum Ruling,31 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Edilberto Caceres. (Filing fee $505, receipt number ALAWDC-5566388)(aty,Khouri, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Memorandum Ruling | ||
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 04/24 11:29 AM
JUDGMENT in accordance with the30 Memorandum Ruling, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Request for Oral Argument (Doc. 22) be DENIED and Defendant Preload, LLCs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 24) be GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining claims in this matter be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/24/2023. (crt,Stewart, T) |
|
30 | 30
10
pgs
order
Memorandum Ruling
Mon 04/24 11:26 AM
MEMORANDUM RULING re22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Oral Argument filed by Edilberto Caceres,24 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Preload L L C. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/24/2023. (crt,Stewart, T) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 03/24 2:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Preload L L C. (aty,Mayeaux, Ben) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
27
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/20 3:11 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re24 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edilberto Caceres.(aty,Khouri, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of material facts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit David Jeter Deposition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Raymond Harvey Deposition, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Corporate Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Chris Herrington Original Report and Affidavit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Dr. Tu Original Report and Affidavit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Jaime Pena Deposition, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Jamal Harvey Deposition, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Jeffrey Neblett Deposition, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Jose Alvarez Deposition, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Chris Herrington Jan 16 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Affidavit of Dr. Jeui-Feng Tu, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Ruling (filed 2-17-22 by Court), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Memorandum Ruling | ||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 03/08 1:45 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Oral Argument filed by Edilberto Caceres. (aty,Khouri, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 03/01 11:08 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Oral Argument filed by Preload L L C.(aty,Mayeaux, Ben) |
|
Att: 1 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Uncontested Facts | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Tue 02/28 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:24 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion day set for 4/26/2023 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Thomas, T) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 02/28 11:45 AM
CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by Preload L L C.(aty,Mayeaux, Ben) Modified on 2/28/2023 (Thomas, T) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Uncontested Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Memorandum Ruling, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Deposition of David Jeter, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Deposition of Raymond Harvey, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Deposition of Jeffery Wayne Neblett, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Deposition of Blake Peters, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F - Deposition of Jamal Harvey, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G - Deposition of Jaime Pena, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H - Deposition of Jose Luis Alavarez Alcala | ||
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Fri 02/17 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Oral Argument. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 3/29/2023 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Thu 02/16 1:54 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Edilberto Caceres.(aty,Khouri, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief In Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of material facts Statement of Uncontested Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit David Jeter Deposition, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Raymond Harvey Deposition, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Corporate Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Chris Herrington Original Report and Affidavit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Dr. Tu Original Report and Affidavit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Jaime Pena Deposition, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Jamal Harvey Deposition, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Jeffery Neblett Deposition, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Jose Alvarez Deposition, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Chris Herrington Jan 16 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Affidavit of Dr. Jeui-Feng Tu, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Ruling (filed 2.17.22 by Court), | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Harvey Order and Reasons | ||
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order - Cain/Kay
Thu 07/07 10:21 AM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER Governing Pretrial Procedure: Jury Trial set for 7/17/2023 09:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2023 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 4/25/2023 01:30 PM in by phone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/20/2023. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/3/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/18/2023. Daubert Motions due by 5/18/2023. Motions in Limine due by 5/18/2023. Compel discovery 5/18/2023. Deadline for filing motion for protective order is 6/20/2023. Pretrial statements due by 6/20/2023. Jury Charges/Verdict Form due by 7/3/2023. Electronic Exhibits due by 7/10/2023. Real Time glossary due by 7/10/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/7/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) |
|
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 07/07 10:19 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/7/2022. Participating by telephone: Catherine Barrett Rice for plaintiff and Ben L. Mayeaux for defendant. A Jury Trial is set for 7/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. A Pretrial Conference is set for 6/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. A Magistrate Judge Status Conference is set for 4/25/2023 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Counsel are to call into Chambers Teleconference Line at 877-336-1274, Access Code 7066014, to participate in the MJSC.See separately docketed Electronic Scheduling Order and the addendum linked thereto for additional deadlines and explanations of those deadlines. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 06/09 10:51 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER. The time of the 7/7/2022 Scheduling Conference previously set by17 Order is CHANGED from 4:00 PM to 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Counsel are to call into the Chambers Teleconference Line at 877-336-1274, Access Code 7066014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 6/9/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) Modified on 6/9/2022 to correct date of scheduling conference (Jones, P) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 05/24 9:58 AM
Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Edilberto Caceres, Preload L L C . (aty,David, Jennifer) Modified on 5/24/2022 to add filer (Jones, P) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Wed 03/30 9:06 AM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 04:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T) |
|
Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel
Mon 02/14 11:37 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Catherine Barrett Rice for Edilberto Caceres. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/14/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Enroll as Counsel
Thu 02/10 10:47 AM
MOTION for Catherine Barrett Rice and Jennifer A. David to Enroll as Counsel by Edilberto Caceres. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/10/2022.(aty,Broussard, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, December 28, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/28 9:59 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Preload L L C.(aty,Mayeaux, Ben) |
|
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 12/16 3:18 PM
JUDGMENT denying8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/16/2021. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
12 | 12
7
pgs
order
Memorandum Ruling
Thu 12/16 3:12 PM
MEMORANDUM RULING re8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Preload L L C. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/16/2021. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 11/30 10:18 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Preload L L C. (aty,Mayeaux, Ben) |
|
Monday, November 29, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/29 3:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Edilberto Caceres. (aty,Broussard, Aaron) Modified docket text on 11/29/2021 (Miletello, A) |
|
Monday, November 08, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Mon 11/08 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 12/29/2021 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Jones, P) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 11/08 8:56 AM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Preload L L C.(aty,Mayeaux, Ben) Modified on 11/8/2021 to edit text (Jones, P) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief | ||
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Thu 11/04 11:58 AM
AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Preload L L C. Amended Notice of Removal .(aty,Mayeaux, Ben) Modified on 11/4/2021 to edit text (Jones, P) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
6 | 6
misc
Response to Removal Order
Thu 11/04 11:53 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Preload L L C .(aty,Mayeaux, Ben) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Wed 11/03 2:38 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/3/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L) |
|
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/02 10:05 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Preload L L C. (aty,Mayeaux, Ben) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Tue 11/02 9:31 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Tue 11/02 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kevin P Merchant, Ben L Mayeaux on behalf of Preload L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/16/2021. (crt,Jones, P) |
|
Monday, November 01, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 11/01 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC, Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-4001 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4879465) filed by Preload, LLC.(Attorney Ben L Mayeaux added to party Preload, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Mayeaux, Ben) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 11/02 9:24 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Jones, P) |