Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. All-Ways Forwarding Int'l Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-09388 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 11, 2022 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Air Tiger Express (Asia), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
All-Ways Forwarding Int'l Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
China Int'l Freight Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laufer Group International Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Master International Logistics (China) Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Orient Express Container Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Yukon Logistics Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
APL Logistics Ltd.
16220 N. Scottsdale Road Suite 300
Scottsdale, AZ 85254 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kuehne + Nagel Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Danmar Lines Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Jessica Ship Holding S.A.
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Patson Logistics Limited
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ocean Network Express PTE LTD.
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD.
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
M/V One Apus, in rem
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft a/k/a Hapag-Lloyd AG
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
HMM Co. Ltd f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine C. Ltd
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Chidori Ship Holding LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Kuehne + Nagel Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
FedEx International Freight Forwarding Agency Services (Shanghai) Company Limited
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Danmar Lines Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Orient Express Container Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
All-Ways Forwarding Int'l Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Air Tiger Express (Asia), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
APL Logistics Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
221 | 221
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 09/13 6:51 PM
ORDER In light of the parties' representation that this matter has been resolved, see Dkt. 661, In re: One Apus Container Ship Incident on November 30, 2020, 22-MD-3028, the settlement conference scheduled for September 26, 2024, is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 9/13/2024) (jca) |