In re: One Apus Container Ship Incident on November 30, 2020
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-md-03028 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
649 | 649
order
Memo Endorsement
Fri 09/06 10:13 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:648 Letter, filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A. ENDORSEMENT: The Court grants the requested two-month extension of the pause in litigation activity and the deadline for filing the proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order in actions not being fully resolved by the Settlement Agreement. The next status update is due October 1, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/5/2024) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
648 | 648
misc
Letter
Tue 09/03 3:50 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Timothy Semenoro dated September 3, 2024 re: Status update. Document filed by CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A...(Semenoro, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summary Tables | ||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
647 | 647
order
Memo Endorsement
Fri 08/30 6:36 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:646 Letter filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A. ENDORSEMENT: No later than September 13th, Chidori Ship Holding LLC and Jessica Ship Holding SA shall file a status letter, jointly on behalf of the relevant parties, updating the Court as to their settlement progress (without divulging confidential details) and advising the Court whether the formal settlement conference scheduled for September 26, 2024, is still required. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 8/30/2024) (tro) |
|
646 | 646
misc
Letter
Fri 08/30 11:57 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Timothy Semenoro dated August 30, 2024 re: Status update. Document filed by CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A...(Semenoro, Timothy) |