DiMartile v. Cuomo
Original Case: 1:20-cv-00859
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-02988 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Kathleen Hochul
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Letitia James
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mark C. Poloncarz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Empire State Development Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Erie County Department of Health
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jenna M. DiMartile
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Justin G. Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Pamella Giglia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joe Durolek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
David Shamenda
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 15 2023
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district, by DAL, SLC, JFB, FILED.[3569155] [21-2988] |
Docket last updated: 09/18/2023 4:26 AM EDT |
Monday, December 06, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Justin G. Crawford, Jenna M. DiMartile, Joe Durolek, Pamella Giglia and David Shamenda, FILED. [3223780] 21-2988 [Entered: 12/06/2021 05:08 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 19 pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/02/2021, RECEIVED.[3223782] 21-2988 [Entered: 12/06/2021 05:12 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Justin G. Crawford, Jenna M. DiMartile, Joe Durolek, Pamella Giglia and David Shamenda, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5729681, FILED.[3223783] 21-2988 [Entered: 12/06/2021 05:13 PM] | |
7 | 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3223787] 21-2988 [Entered: 12/06/2021 05:18 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |