National Abortion Federation v. Center for Medical Progress, et al
Original Case: 3:15-cv-03522
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-15102 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 26, 2022 12:26 AM PST |
Defendant
TROY NEWMAN
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
BIOMAX PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DAVID DALEIDEN, AKA Robert Daoud Sarkis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/26/2022 12:22 AM PST |
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/31/2022. Transcript ordered by 02/24/2022. Transcript due 03/24/2022. Appellants Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden opening brief due 05/03/2022. Appellee National Abortion Federation answering brief due 06/03/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12349100] (RT) [Entered: 01/24/2022 02:13 PM] | |
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediaiton Letter | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire | ||
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet | ||
2 | 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James R. Sigel (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellee National Abortion Federation. Date of service: 01/24/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12349649] 22-15102 (Sigel, James) [Entered: 01/24/2022 06:12 PM] |