AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC. et al v. M/V ONE APUS in rem et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05220 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | M 22-1 Designation by U.S. Attorney of individual to accept service of summons and complaint |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 5:17 AM EST |
Defendant
HMM Co Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hapag-Lloyd A.G.
|
|
Defendant
M/V One Apus in rem
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shipco Transport Inc
|
|
Defendant
CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.
|
|
Defendant
NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ait Worldwide Logistics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
93 | 93
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/14 12:27 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. On this day, the Court considered AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., TopOcean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc., and their attorneys' Motion for Leave to Withdraw (the "Motion") as counsel for Plaintiffs. After considering the Motion, and being fully advised, the Motion shall be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Kenderick M. Jordan is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel of record for Plaintiffs, AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., TopOcean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. and shall be removed from the CM/ECF electronic distribution list. Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/2024) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
92 | 92
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/13 1:16 PM
MOTION for Kenderick M. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ait Worldwide Logistics Inc...(Jordan, Kenderick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel |