C.H. ROBINSON INTERNATIONAL INC. v. M/V ONE APUS et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05221 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 3:52 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
|
|
Cross Defendant
JESSICA SHIP HOLDINGS S.A.
|
|
Cross Defendant
M/V ONE Apus
|
|
Cross Defendant
NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.
|
|
Defendant
CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hapag-Lloyd A.G.
|
|
Defendant
JESSICA SHIP HOLDINGS S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M/V ONE Apus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NYK SHIP MANAGEMENT PTE LTD.
|
|
Defendant
OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C.H. Robinson International Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/14 12:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. On this day, the Court considered C.H. Robinson International, Inc., and its attorneys' Motion for Leave to Withdraw (the "Motion") as counsel for Plaintiff. After considering the Motion, and being fully advised, the Motion shall be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Kenderick M. Jordan is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel of record for Plaintiff, C.H. Robinson International, Inc. and shall be removed from the CM/ECF electronic distribution list. Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/2024) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/13 1:20 PM
MOTION for Kenderick M. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by C.H. Robinson International Inc...(Jordan, Kenderick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel |