DAMCO INTERNATIONAL B.V. et al v. Motor Vessel ONE APUS et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05222 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 4:53 AM EST |
Defendant
CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JESSICA SHIPHOLDING S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Motor Vessel ONE APUS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NYK Shipmanagement Pte Ltd
|
|
Defendant
OCEAN NETWORKS EXPRESS PTE LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damco International B.V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maersk Logistics & Services International A/S
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
64 | 64
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 06/28 6:01 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (622 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A.. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 9/6/2024., Motions due by 9/6/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/28/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (tg) |