Navigators Management Company, Inc. v. Airport Clearance Service, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05223 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1441nr Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Airport Clearance Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Navigators Management Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Headwin Global Logistics (USA) Inc.
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
M/V ONE Apus
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Airport Clearance Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
64 | 64
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 06/28 6:01 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (622 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A.. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 9/6/2024., Motions due by 9/6/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/28/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (tg) |