Navigators Management Company, Inc. v. Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05228 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 46:30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 5:11 AM EST |
Defendant
Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Navigators Management Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
57 | 57
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/14 12:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting56 MOTION for Kenderick M. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Kenderick M. Jordan is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel of record for Defendant, Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. and shall be removed from the CM/ECF electronic distribution list. Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/2024) (jca) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/13 11:58 AM
MOTION for Kenderick M. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc...(Jordan, Kenderick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel |