Federal Insurance Company v. AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05245 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 3:53 AM EST |
Defendant
Ait Worldwide Logistics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
50 | 50
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/14 12:28 PM
ORDER granting49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kenderick M. Jordan is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel of record for Defendant, AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. and shall be removed from the CM/ECF electronic distribution list. Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/2024) (tro) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
49 | 49
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/13 12:12 PM
MOTION for Kenderick M. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ait Worldwide Logistics Inc...(Jordan, Kenderick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel |