Navigators Management Company, Inc. v. Apex Logistics International, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05265 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 4:48 AM EST |
Defendant
Apex Logistics International Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Four Season Logistics Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Navigators Management Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Hecny Shipping Limited
Terminated: 12/22/2021
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
66 | 66
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/14 12:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. On this day, the Court considered TopOcean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc. ("TopOcean"), and its attorneys' Motion for Leave to Withdraw (the "Motion") as counsel for Defendant, TopOcean. After considering the Motion, and being fully advised, the Motion shall be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Kenderick M. Jordan is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel of record for Defendant, TopOcean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles), Inc. and shall be removed from the CM/ECF electronic distribution list. Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/2024) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
65 | 65
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/13 12:31 PM
MOTION for Kenderick M. Jordan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc...(Jordan, Kenderick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel |