Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Apex Logistics International Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05277 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2022 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
Apex Logistics International Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Knights Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd
|
|
Plaintiff
Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Intact Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Yang Ming (America) Corporation
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Roes 1-10
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ocean Network Express Pte., Ltd. ONE
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ocean Network Express (North America), Inc.
(as to Third Party Complaint Doc No. 48 filed 1/27/2022) 8730 Stony Point Parkway
Richmond, VA 23235 |
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft a/k/a Hapag-Lloyd AG
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Trans Knights Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
118 | 118
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Fri 09/13 12:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Default Paperwork and Order to Show Cause served on Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd. on 09/12/24. Service was accepted by James Duan - Person in Charge of the Office. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd...(Southwick, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
117 | 117
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 09/11 11:47 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs' papers in support of its motion are in good order. If Tianshi wishes to oppose the motion, its counsel shall enter a notice of appearance prior to October 2, 2024, and file an opposition on ECF, explaining why a default judgment is not warranted by October 2, 2024. Plaintiffs are to serve this order, and the papers in support of its motion for default judgment, on Tianshi forthwith and file proof of this service no later than September 17, 2024. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 10/2/2024) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/11/2024) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
116 | 116
misc
Proposed Default Judgment
Tue 09/10 3:32 PM
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd...(Southwick, Joshua) |
|
115 | 115
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Tue 09/10 3:31 PM
DECLARATION of Karen Haack in Support re: (113 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd. .. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05277-PAE.(Southwick, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Commercial Invoice & Packing List 1), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Commercial Invoice & Packing List 2), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Tianshi Bill of Lading), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Quartz Logistics Invoice), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Email Correspondence from Quartz), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Claim Adjustment Breakdown Email), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Subrogation Receipt from CHUBB), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Payment Confirmation Email) | ||
114 | 114
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Tue 09/10 3:28 PM
DECLARATION of Joshua A. Southwick in Support re: (113 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd. .. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05277-PAE.(Southwick, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (Complaint in CDCA), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (POS of Summons re: Tianshi in CDCA), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (Default in CDCA), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (Clerk's Cert of Default), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (Proposed Judgment) | ||
113 | 113
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 09/10 3:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd. . Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05277-PAE.(Southwick, Joshua) |
|
112 | 112
misc
Proposed Default Judgment
Tue 09/10 1:41 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd...(Southwick, Joshua) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 9/10/2024 (km) |
|
111 | 111
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Tue 09/10 1:36 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Karen Haack in Support re: (109 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd. .. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05277-PAE.(Southwick, Joshua) Modified on 9/10/2024 (km) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Commercial Invoice & Packing List 1), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Commercial Invoice & Packing List 2), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Tianshi Bill of Lading), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Quartz Logistics Invoice), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Email Correspondence from Quartz), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Claim Adjustment Breakdown Email), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Subrogation Receipt from CHUBB), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Karen Haack (Payment Confirmation Email) | ||
110 | 110
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Tue 09/10 1:31 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Joshua A. Southwick in Support re: (109 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd. .. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05277-PAE.(Southwick, Joshua) Modified on 9/10/2024 (km) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (Complaint in CDCA), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (POS of Summons re: Tianshi in CDCA), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (Default in CDCA), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (Clerk's Cert of Default), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Joshua Southwick (Proposed Judgment) | ||
109 | 109
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 09/10 1:14 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd. . Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05277-PAE.(Southwick, Joshua) Modified on 9/10/2024 (km) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Order
Tue 09/10 1:53 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Joshua Southwick to RE-FILE Document No. (110 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE, 651 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Declaration in Support (112 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE, 653 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Proposed Default Judgment, (650 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 109 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd.., (111 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE, 652 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Declaration in Support. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The documents have the wrong case number listed on them. Please correct the case numbers on the documents and re-file each document separately. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05277-PAE(km) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Tue 09/10 3:48 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (657 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 116 in 1:22-cv-05277-PAE) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:22-cv-05277-PAE(km) |