ACE American Insurance Company et al v. America Pacific Container Line, Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
Lead case: 1:22-md-03028
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05302 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014) |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2022 3:25 AM EST |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Scott E. Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ace American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ocean Network Express (North America), Inc.
8730 Stony Point Parkway
Richmond, VA 23235 |
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Ocean Network Express Pte., Ltd. ONE
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Roes 1-10
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Yang Ming (America) Corporation
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
America Pacific Container Line, Inc.
Terminated: 08/19/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vantec HTS Forwarding, Ltd
Terminated: 08/19/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
63 | 63
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 06/28 6:01 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (622 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter filed by Chidori Ship Holding LLC, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., Jessica Ship Holding S.A.. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 9/6/2024., Motions due by 9/6/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/28/2024) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al. (tg) |